EP0687853 - Staged combustion for reducing nitrogen oxides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 22.04.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PRAXAIR TECHNOLOGY, INC. 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury, CT 06810-5113 / US | [1995/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kobayashi, William Thoru Rua Alcatrazes 60 04144 Sao Paulo-SP / BR | 02 /
Francis, Arthur Wellington Jr. RD-1 Box 428 Monroe, New York 10950 / US | 03 /
Kobayashi, Hisashi 170 Barger Street Putnam Valley, New York 10579 / US | [1995/51] | Representative(s) | Schwan, Gerhard Schwan Schwan Schorer Patentanwälte Bauerstrasse 22 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/51] | Schwan, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Elfenstrasse 32 D-81739 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95109042.2 | 12.06.1995 | [1995/51] | Priority number, date | US19940259110 | 13.06.1994 Original published format: US 259110 | [1995/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0687853 | Date: | 20.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0687853 | Date: | 05.03.1997 | [1997/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0687853 | Date: | 27.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F23C6/04, F23C1/00 | [1995/51] | CPC: |
F23C1/00 (EP,US);
F23D11/10 (KR);
F23C6/045 (EP,US);
F23L7/007 (EP,US);
F23D2900/00006 (EP,US);
Y02E20/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, IT, NL, PT [1995/51] | Title | German: | Stufenweise Verbrennung zur Reduktion von Stickstoffoxiden | [1995/51] | English: | Staged combustion for reducing nitrogen oxides | [1995/51] | French: | Combustion étagée pour la réduction d'oxydes d'azote | [1995/51] | Examination procedure | 13.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/19] | 14.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 24.03.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 03.04.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
26.06.2001
17.08.2001
ADMISSIBLE L'AIR LIQUIDE S.A. 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR Opponent's representative Vesin, Jacques L'Air Liquide S.A. Service Propriété Industrielle, 75 Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2008/32] |
Former [2001/34] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.06.2001
L'AIR LIQUIDE S.A. 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR Opponent's representative Vesin, Jacques L'AIR LIQUIDE 75 Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | 10.07.2001 | No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 13.08.2001 | No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 22.08.2001 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.02.2002 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 21.01.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.02.2003 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 17.02.2005 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 27.02.2005 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2005/23] | Appeal following opposition | 16.04.2003 | Appeal received No. T0451/03 | 19.06.2003 | Statement of grounds filed | 17.02.2005 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 17.02.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.03.2005 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2079439 (KOBE STEEL LTD); | [AD]US5076779 (KOBAYASHI HISASHI [US]) [AD] 1,4 * the whole document *; | [YA]DE4142401 (LINDE AG [DE]) [Y] 1-3 * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 60; figure . * [A] 4; | [YD]US5242296 (TUSON GEOFFREY B [US], et al) [YD] 1-3 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5076779 | US5242296 |