EP0688547 - Mammary prosthesis for women having an amputated breast and method for manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.02.2001 [2001/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F + E Gesellschaft für Bekleidungsinnovation mbH & Co. KG Grafenstrasse 23 83098 Brannenburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/25] | For all designated states F + E Gesellschaft für Bekleidungsinnovation mbH & Co. KG Grafenstrasse 23 83098 Brannenburg / DE | ||
Former [1995/52] | For all designated states Dr. HELBIG GmbH & Co. ORTHOPÄDISCHE PRODUKTE KG Grafenstrasse 23 D-83098 Brannenburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weber-Unger, Georg Pienzenauer Strasse 15 A-6330 Kufstein / AT | 02 /
Volk, Stephan Auf der Grün 2 D-83714 Miesbach / DE | [1995/52] | Representative(s) | Haug, Dietmar, et al Andrae Westendorp Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Balanstrasse 55 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/52] | Haug, Dietmar, et al Patentanwälte Andrae, Flach, Haug, Kneissl Balanstrasse 55 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95109362.4 | 16.06.1995 | [1995/52] | Priority number, date | DE19944421516 | 20.06.1994 Original published format: DE 4421516 | [1995/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0688547 | Date: | 27.12.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0688547 | Date: | 17.07.1996 | [1996/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0688547 | Date: | 08.03.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/52 | [1995/52] | CPC: |
A61F2/52 (EP,US);
B29C43/021 (EP,US);
B29C43/206 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30448 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30451 (EP,US);
A61F2002/5007 (EP,US);
A61F2002/5055 (EP,US);
A61F2002/7881 (EP,US);
A61F2220/005 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0058 (EP,US);
B29C35/02 (EP,US);
B29K2083/00 (EP,US);
Y10T156/108 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL [1995/52] | Title | German: | Brustprothese für brustamputierte Frauen und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1995/52] | English: | Mammary prosthesis for women having an amputated breast and method for manufacturing the same | [1995/52] | French: | Prothèse mammaire pour femmes avec un sein amputé et sa procédé de fabrication | [1995/52] | Examination procedure | 07.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/40] | 15.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB484367 (MADELON LOUDEN) [A] 1,8 * page 1, line 68 - page 2, line 39; figure - *; | [A]DE2827076 (HELBIG & CO) [A] 1,3,7,8,11,15 * page 9, paragraph 2 - page 11, paragraph 2; figure - *; | [DA]DE8701925U (ANITA SPEZIALMIEDERFABRIK DR. HELBIG GMBH ET AL.) [DA] 1,8,11 * page 5, line 15 - page 6, line 17; figure . *; | [A]WO8905615 (GREENBERG BERT [US]) [A] 1,5,6 * page 5, line 8 - line 26; figure 2 *; | [PA]WO9424964 (AMOENA MED ORTHOPAEDIE TECH [DE], et al) [PA] 1,7,11* the whole document * | by applicant | DE2827077 | US4795464 |