EP0692349 - Positioning device, in particular for sawing or milling machines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.02.1998 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.04.1998 [1998/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Optical and Electronic Engineering Dr. Ing. ETH Paul D. Iten Kreuzmattwald 2 6047 Kastanienbaum / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1996/03] | For all designated states Optical and Electronic Engineering Dr. Ing. ETH Paul D. Iten Kreuzmattwald 2 CH-6047 Kastanienbaum / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iten, Paul D. Dr.phil.nat.Dipl.Ing.ETH Kreuzmattwald 2 CH-6047 Kastanienbaum / CH | 02 /
Iten, Dominik M. Kreuzmattwald 2 CH- 6047 Kastanienbaum / CH | [1996/03] | Representative(s) | Blum, Rudolf Emil, et al E. BLUM & Co. AG Patent- und Markenanwälte VSP Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1996/03] | Blum, Rudolf Emil Ernst, et al c/o E. Blum & Co Patentanwälte Vorderberg 11 CH-8044 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 95109409.3 | 18.06.1995 | [1996/03] | Priority number, date | CH19940001970 | 21.06.1994 Original published format: CH 197094 | [1996/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0692349 | Date: | 17.01.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0692349 | Date: | 15.01.1997 | [1997/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B27G5/02, B23Q1/25, B23Q3/18, B23Q3/00, B27B27/06, B27B27/08 | [1997/03] | CPC: |
B23Q3/007 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1996/03] | B27G5/02, B23Q1/25, B23Q3/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, NL [1996/03] | Title | German: | Positioniervorrichtung, insbesondere für Sägen und Fräsmaschinen | [1996/03] | English: | Positioning device, in particular for sawing or milling machines | [1996/03] | French: | Dispositif de positionnement, en particulier pour des scies et des machines à fraiser | [1996/03] | Examination procedure | 16.07.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/16] | 11.11.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1998/16] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 28.08.1997 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1997 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE9307635U (LEONARD HOFMANN MASCHINENFABRIK GMBH) [X] 1,2,4,6 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO9425230 (ALTENDORF WILHELM GMBH CO KG [DE], et al) [PX] 1,2 * page 2, paragraph 4 - page 4, paragraph 3; claims 1,4 *; | [Y]DE4219110 (GRESSER GERMAN [DE]) [Y] 1 * claim 1 *; | [DYA]DE3917146 (HIRSCH WILHELM [DE]) [DY] 1 * the whole document * [A] 3; | [A]DE1628865 (OTTO BECK KG WERKZEUG UND MASC) [A] 2 * page 8, line 10 - line 16; figures 5,6 * | by applicant | DE3917146 |