EP0688634 - Dressing tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/52] | Abrasive tools and method for producing same | ||
[2000/46] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 24.08.2001 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORTON COMPANY 1 New Bond Street, Box No. 15138 Worcester Massachusetts 01615-0138 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/52] | For all designated states NORTON COMPANY 1 New Bond Street, Box No. 15138 Worcester, Massachusetts 01615-0138 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Andrews, Richard M. 56 Upton Road Westborough, MA 01581 / US | [1995/52] | Representative(s) | Diehl & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Erika-Mann-Straße 9 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | Diehl & Partner Patentanwälte Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/52] | DIEHL GLAESER HILTL & PARTNER Flüggenstrasse 13 D-80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95109535.5 | 20.06.1995 | [1995/52] | Priority number, date | US19940263962 | 22.06.1994 Original published format: US 263962 | [1995/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0688634 | Date: | 27.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0688634 | Date: | 26.06.1996 | [1996/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B24D3/08 | [1996/25] | CPC: |
C22C26/00 (EP,US);
B24D3/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/52] | B24D3/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/52] | Title | German: | Schleifwerkzeug | [2000/46] | English: | Dressing tool | [2000/46] | French: | Outil abrasif | [2000/46] |
Former [1995/52] | Schleifwerkzeug und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | ||
Former [1995/52] | Abrasive tools and method for producing same | ||
Former [1995/52] | Outil abrasif et méthode pour sa fabrication | Examination procedure | 06.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/05] | 03.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 04.05.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2001/41] | 14.05.2001 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2001/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2001 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0198627 (NL PETROLEUM PROD [GB]) [X] 1-3,5,7-9,11,13 * the whole document * * page 3, line 25 - page 5, line 10 * * page 7, line 7 - line 25 * * claims 1-5 *; | [X]DE3918606 (BECK ALEXANDER [CH]) [X] 1,2,4,9,10 * the whole document * * column 2, line 1 - line 5 *; | [A]RU707073 ; | [A]US4168957 (LEE MINYOUNG, et al) [A] 1,2,4,9,10 * the whole document * * column 1, line 20 - line 65 * * column 5, line 53 - column 6, line 41 * * tables I-CONT.,EX.12 * * claim 1 * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 95, no. 22, Database accession no. 95-168501, XP002001399 & SU707073 A 19940615 (AS. USSR HIGH PRESSURE PHYS. INST.) [A] 1,2,4 * abstract * |