EP0693271 - Optical glucose sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic MiniMed, Inc. 18000 Devonshire Street Northridge, CA 91325-1219 / US | [2002/09] |
Former [1996/04] | For all designated states Minimed Inc. 12744 San Fernando Road Sylmar, California 91342 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Slate, John B. 3914 Kendall St. San Diego, CA 92109 / US | 02 /
Lord, Peter C. 25505 Old Course Way Valencia, CA 91355 / US | [1996/04] | Representative(s) | Ruschke, Hans Edvard, et al Ruschke Madgwick Seide & Kollegen Patentanwälte Patent Attorney (UK) PartG mbB Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/04] | Ruschke, Hans Edvard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Ruschke & Partner Pienzenauerstrasse 2 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95109545.4 | 20.06.1995 | [1996/04] | Priority number, date | US19940276453 | 18.07.1994 Original published format: US 276453 | [1996/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0693271 | Date: | 24.01.1996 | [1996/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0693271 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00 | [2004/18] | CPC: |
A61B5/1459 (EP,US);
A61B5/14532 (EP,US);
C12Q1/006 (EP,US);
G01N21/7703 (EP,US);
G01N2021/772 (EP,US);
G01N2021/7759 (EP,US);
G01N2021/7786 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1996/04] | A61B5/14, A61B5/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1996/04] | Title | German: | Optischer Glukose-Sensor | [1996/04] | English: | Optical glucose sensor | [1996/04] | French: | Capteur optique de glucose | [2003/47] |
Former [1996/04] | Capteur au glucose optique | Examination procedure | 25.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/35] | 23.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 28.04.2004 | IT | 28.04.2004 | LI | 28.04.2004 | NL | 28.04.2004 | DK | 28.07.2004 | SE | 28.07.2004 | [2008/05] |
Former [2006/13] | CH | 28.04.2004 | |
LI | 28.04.2004 | ||
NL | 28.04.2004 | ||
DK | 28.07.2004 | ||
SE | 28.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | CH | 28.04.2004 | |
LI | 28.04.2004 | ||
DK | 28.07.2004 | ||
SE | 28.07.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | CH | 28.04.2004 | |
LI | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.07.2004 | ||
Former [2004/51] | CH | 28.04.2004 | |
LI | 28.04.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4703756 (GOUGH DAVID A [US], et al) [Y] 1-11; | [Y]EP0243116 (CARDIOVASCULAR DEVICES INC [US]) [Y] 1-11; | [A]GB2261729 (SHARMA ASHUTOSH [GB]) [A] 1,6; | [A]US4890620 (GOUGH DAVID A [US]) [A] 1,2,4-6; | [A]US4484987 (GOUGH DAVID A [US]) [A] 1,2,4-6 | Examination | US5238809 |