EP0698630 - Epoxy resins, their preparation and use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.2005 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Surface Specialties Germany GmbH & Co. KG Industriepark Kalle-Albert, Rheingaustrasse 190-196 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | [2003/26] |
Former [2001/47] | For all designated states Solutia Germany GmbH & Co. KG Boelckestrasse 26 55252 Mainz-Kastel / DE | ||
Former [1996/09] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Neumann, Uwe, Dr. Am Höhberg 10a D-65307 Bad Schwalbach / DE | 02 /
Hönel, Michael, Dr. Bertha-von-Suttner-Strasse 14 D-65189 Wiesbaden / DE | [1996/09] | Representative(s) | Deckers, Hellmuth Alexander European Patent Attorney Breitbachstrasse 15 55218 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/02] | Deckers, Hellmuth, Dr. European Patent Attorney, Bahnhofstrasse 26/A 55218 Ingelheim / DE | ||
Former [2003/26] | Deckers, Hellmuth, Dr. Patentanwaltskanzlei Zounek, Industriepark Kalle-Albert, Rheingaustrasse 190-196 65174 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [1998/14] | Zounek, Nikolai, Dipl.-Ing. Patentsanwaltskanzlei Zounek, Industriepark Kalle Albert, Gebäude H287 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 95109604.9 | 21.06.1995 | [1996/09] | Priority number, date | DE19944422869 | 30.06.1994 Original published format: DE 4422869 | DE19944436095 | 10.10.1994 Original published format: DE 4436095 | [1996/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0698630 | Date: | 28.02.1996 | [1996/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0698630 | Date: | 10.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C08G59/24 | [1996/09] | CPC: |
C08L51/08 (EP);
C08F290/064 (EP);
C08F290/144 (EP);
C08G18/0814 (EP);
C08G18/581 (EP);
C08G18/8029 (EP);
C08G59/063 (EP);
C08G59/066 (EP);
C08G59/245 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C08L63/00, C08L2666/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1999/34] |
Former [1998/16] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE | ||
Former [1996/09] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Neuartige Epoxidharze, ihre Herstellung und Verwendung | [1996/09] | English: | Epoxy resins, their preparation and use | [1996/09] | French: | Résines époxydes, leur préparation et utilisation | [1996/09] | Examination procedure | 28.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/44] | 14.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 07.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 10.03.2004 | AT | 21.06.2004 | ES | 21.06.2004 | [2008/05] |
Former [2005/51] | AT | 21.06.2004 | |
ES | 21.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | ES | 21.06.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5300618 (DURAIRAJ RAJ B [US]) [X] 1-8* examples 6,7; claim - * | by applicant | DE19944436097 |