EP0675389 - Automatic light modulating camera [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.10.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.12.1999 [1999/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIKON CORPORATION 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/40] | For all designated states NIKON CORPORATION 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takagi, Tadao 18-3-7-302, Utsukushigaoka 1-chome Midori-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1995/40] | Representative(s) | Burke, Steven David, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/40] | Burke, Steven David, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 95109699.9 | 19.03.1991 | [1995/40] | Priority number, date | JP19900069251 | 19.03.1990 Original published format: JP 6925190 | JP19900088898 | 03.04.1990 Original published format: JP 8889890 | JP19900088899 | 03.04.1990 Original published format: JP 8889990 | JP19900088900 | 03.04.1990 Original published format: JP 8890090 | [1995/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0675389 | Date: | 04.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0675389 | Date: | 25.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G03B7/16, G03B7/099 | [1995/40] | CPC: |
G03B7/09974 (EP,US);
G03B7/17 (EP,US);
G03B7/08 (EP,US);
G03B7/09976 (EP,US);
G03B7/09979 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/40] | Title | German: | Automatische Kamera mit Lichtmodulation | [1995/40] | English: | Automatic light modulating camera | [1995/40] | French: | Caméra automatique à modulation de la lumière | [1995/40] | Examination procedure | 18.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/12] | 04.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.06.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/50] | 14.07.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/50] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP91302383.4 / EP0448363 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS56159622 ; | [A]JPS6132041 ; | [A]GB2067773 (NIPPON KOGAKU KK) [A] 6,7 * figures 1-3; claim 1 * * page 4, line 28 - page 5, line 19 *; | [A]US4639112 (NAKAI MASAAKI [JP], et al) [A] 4 * abstract * * column 3, line 15 - line 51 ** column 4, line 53 - line 65 *; | [A]JPS62169134 (CANON KK) [A] 1,2,5; | [A]US4746947 (NAKAI MASAAKI [JP]) [A] 1,2,5-14 * figures 1-4,8; claim 1 * * column 1, paragraph 1 * * column 2, line 33 - line 43 * * column 4, line 4 - column 5, line 52 * * column 7, line 43 - line 53 * * column 9, line 10 - line 58 *; | [A]US4769666 (KUMAKURA TOSHIYUKI [JP]) [A] 2,5,6 * column 1, paragraph 1; figure 2 * * claim 1 *; | [A]JPH01280737 (CANON KK) [A] 2,5,6,8; | US4969005 [ ] (TOKUNAGA TATSUYUKI [JP]) [ ] * figures 1-4; claim 1 * * column 1, paragraph 1 * * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 44 * * column 3, line 56 - column 5, line 23 *; | US5023647 [ ] (SHIOMI YASUHIKO [JP], et al) [ ] * figure 1; claims 1-3 * * column 1, line 14 - line 21 * * column 2, line 32 - column 3, line 12 * * column 3, line 30 - column 4, line 8 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820313), vol. 6, no. 41, Database accession no. (P - 106), & JP56159622 A 19811209 (BURONIKA) [A] 5 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860626), vol. 10, no. 183, Database accession no. (P - 472), & JP61032041 A 19860214 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL) [A] 7 * abstract * | by applicant | JPS6015626 | JPS6290633 | US4965620 |