EP0692778 - Method of controlling an electron source in a field emission device for a cold cathode field emission display [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/03] | Method of controlling an electron source | ||
[2000/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.2002 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.12.2002 [2002/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | [1996/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Smith, Robert T. 222 W. Brown Road No. 54 Mesa, Arizona 85201 / US | 02 /
Barker, Dean 6445 S. Maple No. 2087 Tempe, Arizona 85283 / US | [1996/03] | Representative(s) | Hudson, Peter David, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Midpoint Alencon Link, Basingstoke Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/03] | Hudson, Peter David, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 95109711.2 | 22.06.1995 | [1996/03] | Priority number, date | US19940268987 | 30.06.1994 Original published format: US 268987 | [1996/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0692778 | Date: | 17.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0692778 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/22 | [1996/03] | CPC: |
G09G3/22 (EP,KR,US);
G09G3/2011 (EP,KR,US);
G09G3/2014 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR, NL [1996/03] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Steuern einer Elektronenquelle in einer Feldemissions-Electronquelle für Kaltkathodenfeldemissions-Anzeigevorrichtung | [2000/45] | English: | Method of controlling an electron source in a field emission device for a cold cathode field emission display | [2000/45] | French: | Méthode de commande d'une source d'électrons dans un cathode à emission de champ et affichage à emission de champ | [2000/45] |
Former [1996/03] | Verfahren zum Steuern einer Elektronenquelle | ||
Former [1996/03] | Method of controlling an electron source | ||
Former [1996/03] | Méthode de commande d'une source d'électrons | Examination procedure | 17.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/37] | 08.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 19.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/50] | Request for further processing for: | 19.04.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 19.04.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.05.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PXA]EP0635819 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR], et al) [PX] 1 * abstract * * page 3, line 40 - page 4, line 26 * * page 6, line 15 - page 7, line 8; figure 5 * [PA] 2-4 | Examination | EP0479450 | by applicant | US5191217 |