EP0691364 - Epoxy group containing siloxanes and their mixtures with polycarbonates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.01.2002 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.03.2002 [2002/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [2001/12] |
Former [1996/02] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Buekers, Josef Kneinstr. 58a D-47807 Krefeld / DE | 02 /
Bier, Peter, Dr. Bethelstr. 27 D-47800 Krefeld / DE | 03 /
Schlitte, Sabine, Dr. Von-Kniprode Weg 7 D-40764 Langenfeld / DE | 04 /
Eversheim, Hubertus Altenberger Str. 18 D-42929 Wermelskirchen / DE | 05 /
Meier, Helmut-Martin, Dr. Am Obersthof 3 D-40883 Ratingen / DE | [1996/02] | Application number, filing date | 95109934.0 | 26.06.1995 | [1996/02] | Priority number, date | DE19944424105 | 08.07.1994 Original published format: DE 4424105 | [1996/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0691364 | Date: | 10.01.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0691364 | Date: | 22.05.1996 | [1996/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0691364 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C08G77/38, C08L69/00, // (C08L69/00, 83:06) | [1996/02] | CPC: |
C08G77/38 (EP,US);
C08L69/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L69/00, C08L83/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/02] | Title | German: | Epoxigruppen enthaltende Siloxane und ihre Mischungen mit Polycarbonaten | [1996/02] | English: | Epoxy group containing siloxanes and their mixtures with polycarbonates | [1996/02] | French: | Siloxanes contenant des groupes époxydés et leurs mélanges avec des polycarbonates | [1996/02] | Examination procedure | 21.10.1996 | Examination requested [1996/51] | 15.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.09.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.01.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 02.01.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5292827 (RALEIGH WILLIAM J [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * claims 1,2,5,6 * * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 8 *; | [X]EP0468305 (GOLDSCHMIDT AG TH [DE]) [X] 1 * claims 1,6,7 *; | [X]EP0281681 (GOLDSCHMIDT AG TH [DE]) [X] 1 * claim 1 * * page 6, line 52 - page 7, line 53 * * page 14, line 35 - line 42 *; | [A]EP0505869 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]US4393158 (MILLER KENNETH F) [A] 1 * claims 1,2 * * column 1, line 6 - line 38 * * column 8, line 25 - line 68 *; | [PA]EP0620242 (DOW CORNING TORAY SILICONE [JP]) [PA] 1 * claims 1,6,9,15 * | by applicant | DE3832396 | US3028365 | US2999835 | US3148172 | US3275601 | US2991273 | US3271367 | US3062781 | US2970131 | US2999846 | DE1570703 | DE2063050 | DE2063052 | DE2211956 | FR1561518 | - H. SCHNELL, Chemistry and Physics of Polycarbonates, Polymer Reviews, INTERSCIENCE PUBL., (1964), vol. IX, page 33FF |