EP0690577 - CMOS integrated circuit for fast propagation of a signal edge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/01] | Fast propagation technique in CMOS integrated circuits | ||
[2000/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2002 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HYUNDAI ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC. 3101 North First Street San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/40] | For all designated states Hyundai Electronics America, Inc. 3101 North First Street San Jose, CA 95134 / US | ||
Former [1996/01] | For all designated states Colwell, Robert C. Steuart Street Tower, One Market Plaza San Francisco, CA 94105-1492 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Proebsting, Robert J. 27800 Edgerton Road Los Altos Hills, CA. 94022 / US | [1996/01] | Representative(s) | Sparing Röhl Henseler Postfach 14 04 43 40074 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Sparing Röhl Henseler Patentanwälte European Patent Attorneys Postfach 14 04 43 40074 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1996/01] | Sparing - Röhl - Henseler Patentanwälte Rethelstrasse 123 D-40237 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 95109976.1 | 27.06.1995 | [1996/01] | Priority number, date | US19940269451 | 30.06.1994 Original published format: US 269451 | [1996/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0690577 | Date: | 03.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0690577 | Date: | 11.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H03K19/017 | [1996/01] | CPC: |
G11C7/1084 (EP,US);
G11C11/34 (KR);
G11C7/1051 (EP,US);
G11C7/1057 (EP,US);
G11C7/1078 (EP,US);
H03K19/01707 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1996/01] | Title | German: | Integrierte CMOS-Schaltung zur schnellen Übertragung einer Signalflanke | [2000/19] | English: | CMOS integrated circuit for fast propagation of a signal edge | [2000/19] | French: | Circuit intégré CMOS à propagation rapide du flanc d'un signal d'entrée | [2000/19] |
Former [1996/01] | Methode zur schnellen Signalübertragung in integrierten CMOS-Schaltungen | ||
Former [1996/01] | Fast propagation technique in CMOS integrated circuits | ||
Former [1996/01] | Technique de la propagation rapide dans circuits CMOS intégrés | Examination procedure | 07.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/27] | 17.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.10.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP00122120.9 / EP1069685 | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5061864 (ROGERS ALAN C [US]) [A] 1-15; | [A]US5274277 (CHAN TIM W [US]) [A] 1-15; | [A]US5247212 (VINAL ALBERT W [US]) [A] 1-15; | [A]EP0348998 (TOSHIBA KK [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 | Examination | EP0347759 | US4973864 | US4496857 | - P.HOROWITZ & W.HILL: "The Art of Electronics", Cambridge University Press, 1980, Cambridge, US; page 376 | by applicant | US4985643 |