EP0689905 - Rotary knife and slicing gauge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BETTCHER INDUSTRIES, INC. State Route 60 at Ohio Turnpike Birmingham Ohio 44816 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/01] | For all designated states BETTCHER INDUSTRIES, INC. State Route 60 at Ohio Turnpike Birmingham Ohio 44816 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Whited, Jeffrey A. 535 Fieldstone Drive Amherst, Ohio 44001 / US | [1996/01] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/01] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95110011.4 | 27.06.1995 | [1996/01] | Priority number, date | US19940268973 | 30.06.1994 Original published format: US 268973 | [1996/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0689905 | Date: | 03.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0689905 | Date: | 13.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B26B25/00 | [1996/01] | CPC: |
B26B25/002 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/01] | Title | German: | Kreismesser und Schneidemessvorrichtung | [1996/01] | English: | Rotary knife and slicing gauge | [1996/01] | French: | Couteau circulaire et jauge coupante | [1996/01] | Examination procedure | 28.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/35] | 20.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 13.08.1997 | [2008/05] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 13.08.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US4516323 (BETTCHER LOUIS A [US], et al) [DA] 1 * column 3, line 33 - column 8, line 63; figures 1-11 *; | [A]US4575937 (MCCULLOUGH TIMOTHY J [US]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 30 - column 8, line 19; figures 1-13 *; | [A]US4175321 (BETTCHER LOUIS A [US]) [A] 1 * column W * | by applicant | US4439924 | US4516323 | GB2238229 |