EP0693855 - Method of requesting teletext pages [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.02.2002 [2002/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DEUTSCHE THOMSON-BRANDT GMBH Hermann-Schwer-Strasse 3 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [2001/10] |
Former [1996/04] | For all designated states DEUTSCHE THOMSON-BRANDT GMBH Hermann-Schwer-Strasse 3 D-78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gyarmati, Sandor Vogelsangweg 18 D-78052 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | 02 /
Blawat, Meinolf Isernhagener Strasse 18 D-30161 Hannover / DE | 03 /
Seegert, Bernhard Neissestrasse 5 D-78052 Villingen / DE | [1996/34] |
Former [1996/04] | 01 /
Gyarmati, Sandor Vogelsangweg 18 D-78052 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Application number, filing date | 95110893.5 | 12.07.1995 | [1996/04] | Priority number, date | DE19944425687 | 21.07.1994 Original published format: DE 4425687 | [1996/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0693855 | Date: | 24.01.1996 | [1996/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0693855 | Date: | 17.09.1997 | [1997/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0693855 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/087, H04N7/088 | [1997/34] | CPC: |
H04N7/0882 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1996/04] | H04N7/087 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1996/04] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Anforderung von Teletextseiten | [1996/04] | English: | Method of requesting teletext pages | [1996/04] | French: | Méthode d'obtention de pages de télétexte | [1996/04] | Examination procedure | 25.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/17] | 02.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 09.06.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 08.09.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.12.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0567185 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [X] 1-5,7 * the whole document * [A] 6,8-10; | [A]WO9100670 (SUPERGUIDE CORP [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 4, line 6 - page 5, line 34 *; | [A]DE4201031 (ISSING LUDWIG J [DE], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]WO9105436 (VIDEOLOGIC LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0525559 (GRUNDIG EMV [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [PX]EP0648054 (IBM [US]) [PX] 1 * column 2, line 30 - column 3, line 40 * |