EP0675361 - Method for storage of labile protein materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.09.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.10.2003 [2003/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, IL 60064-3500 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/40] | For all designated states Abbott Laboratories Chad 0377/AP6D-2, 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, Illinois 60064-3500 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ching, Shanfun 1014 Mayfair Drive Libertyville, Illinois 60048 / US | 02 /
Billing, Patricia A. 903 Bidwell Drive Gurnee, Illinois 60031 / US | 03 /
Gordon, Julian 307 East Sheridan Road Lake Bluff, Illinois 60044 / US | [1995/40] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/40] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub, Baaderstrasse 3 D-80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95110925.5 | 12.07.1988 | [1995/40] | Priority number, date | US19870072459 | 13.07.1987 Original published format: US 72459 | [1995/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0675361 | Date: | 04.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0675361 | Date: | 25.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0675361 | Date: | 06.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/543, G01N33/558, G01N33/531, G01N33/58, // C12Q1/68, G01N33/552, G01N33/52, C12N9/96, C07K17/02 | [1995/40] | CPC: |
G01N33/587 (EP,US);
G01N33/54366 (EP,US);
G01N33/54386 (EP);
G01N33/54388 (US);
G01N33/54393 (EP,US);
G01N33/558 (EP);
G01N33/585 (EP,US);
G01N33/76 (EP,US);
G01N30/90 (EP,US);
Y10S435/967 (EP,US);
Y10S435/97 (EP,US);
Y10S435/975 (EP,US);
Y10S436/801 (EP,US);
Y10S436/807 (EP,US);
Y10S436/808 (EP,US);
Y10S436/826 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1995/40] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Lagerung labiler Proteine | [1995/40] | English: | Method for storage of labile protein materials | [1995/40] | French: | Procédé pour stockage de protéines labiles | [1995/40] | Examination procedure | 15.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/24] | 26.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 17.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 21.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 04.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP88111134.8 / EP0299428 | Opposition(s) | 07.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 09.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 05.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 04.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS61224986 ; | [X]EP0007654 (AKZO NV [NL]) [X] 1,3,4 * page 8, line 4 - page 9, line 13 * * page 15 - page 19 *; | [D]US4313734 (LEUVERING JOHANNES H W); | [X]WO8604095 (UNILEVER NV [NL]) [X] 1,3 * page 3, line 15 - page 5, line 28 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870226), vol. 011, no. 063, Database accession no. (C - 406), & JP61224986 A 19861006 (EISAI CO LTD) [A] 1,2,5 * abstract * | Examination | EP0298368 | by applicant | US4094647 | US4166105 | US4168146 | US4235601 | US4313734 | EP0063810 | US4361537 | US4452901 | US4452886 | US4515893 | US4517288 | EP0158746 | EP0262328 | - FRENS, NATURE, (1973), vol. 241, pages 20 - 23 | - ROMANO, ET AL., IMMUNOCHEMISTRY, (1974), vol. 11, pages 521 - 522 | - GEOGHEGAN, ET AL., J. IMMUNO. METH., (1980), vol. 34, pages 11 - 21 | - SUREK, ET AL., BIOCHEM. AND BIOPHYS. RES. COMM., (1984), vol. 121, pages 284 - 289 | - HSU, ANAL BIOCHEM., (1984), vol. 142, pages 221 - 225 | - HOYE, J. CHROMATOG., (1967), vol. 28, pages 379 - 384 | - J.R. WANDS AND V.R. ZURAWSKI, GASTROENTEROLOGY, (1981), vol. 80, page 225 | - A. MARSHAK-ROTHSTEIN, ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1979), vol. 122, page 2491 | - CROSA, ET AL., J. BACT., (1973), vol. 115, no. 3, pages 904 - 911 | - KORNBERG, DNA Replication, SAN FRANCISCO, W.H. FREEMAN AND CO., (1978), pages 670 - 679 | - DALLAS, ET AL., J. BACTERIOL., (1979), vol. 136, pages 850 - 858 | - SO, ET AL., NATURE, (1979), vol. 277, pages 453 - 456 | US19860912878 |