EP0697685 - Method and device for determining the speed of vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.09.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.11.1999 [1999/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Weiss Electronic Elektronische Regel- und Steuergeräte GmbH Niederkircher Strasse 16 54294 Trier / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/08] | For all designated states Weiss-Electronic GmbH Elektronische Regel- und Steuergeräte, H. Weiss Niederkircher Strasse 16 D-54294 Trier / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beck, Hans-Peter Mühlenstrasse 8 D-54298 Welschbillig / DE | 02 /
Thiel, Heinz Schwarzer Weg 11 D-54293 Trier-Ehrang / DE | 03 /
Luban, Guido Trierer Strasse 24 D-54309 Newel-Butzweiler / DE | [1996/08] | Representative(s) | Grommes, Karl F. Mehlgasse 14-16 56068 Koblenz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/08] | Grommes, Karl F., Dr. Mehlgasse 14-16 D-56068 Koblenz / DE | Application number, filing date | 95110957.8 | 13.07.1995 | [1996/08] | Priority number, date | DE19944427549 | 04.08.1994 Original published format: DE 4427549 | [1996/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0697685 | Date: | 21.02.1996 | [1996/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/052, G01P3/66 | [1996/08] | CPC: |
G08G1/052 (EP,US);
G01P3/66 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1996/08] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bestimmung der Geschwindigkeit von Fahrzeugen | [1996/08] | English: | Method and device for determining the speed of vehicles | [1996/08] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour déterminer la vitesse de véhicules | [1996/08] | Examination procedure | 22.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/35] | 11.01.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.01.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/44] | 09.06.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1999/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1998 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   10.11.1998 | 31.07.1999 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2056688 (PHILIPS NV) [Y] 1 * the whole document *; | [YA]US3685013 (BRICKNER JOSEPH L) [Y] 1 * column 2, line 20 - column 5, line 34; figures 1,2 * [A] 5-9; | [A]DE2648383 (VOLKSWAGENWERK AG) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]GB1271643 (PLESSEY CO LTD) [A] 3,12 * the whole document * |