EP0702924 - Liquid filter for a vacuum cleaner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.2002 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.04.2002 [2002/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GISOWATT S.P.A. Industria Elettrodomestici Via A. Colombo 212 21055 Gorla Minore (Varese) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/13] | For all designated states GISOWATT S.P.A. INDUSTRIA ELETTRODOMESTICI Via A.Colombo 223 I-21055 Gorla Minore (Varese) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sozzi, Validio Via A. Colombo 223 I-21055 Gorla Minore, Varese / IT | [1996/13] | Representative(s) | Altenburg, Udo, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/23] | Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost - Altenburg - Geissler - Isenbruck, Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/13] | Sassi, Romano UFFICIO BREVETTI VARESINO Viale Belforte 89 I-21100 Varese / IT | Application number, filing date | 95111182.2 | 17.07.1995 | [1996/13] | Priority number, date | IT1994VA00024 | 15.07.1994 Original published format: IT VA940024 | [1996/13] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0702924 | Date: | 27.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0702924 | Date: | 18.09.1996 | [1996/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A47L9/18 | [1996/13] | CPC: |
A47L9/181 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, SE [1998/18] |
Former [1996/13] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Flüssigkeitsfilter für einen Staubsauger | [1996/13] | English: | Liquid filter for a vacuum cleaner | [1996/13] | French: | Filtre à liquides pour aspirateur | [1996/13] | Examination procedure | 18.07.1995 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/18] | 19.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) IE, LU, MC, NL, PT | 15.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 02.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/16] | 26.02.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | Request for further processing for: | 02.03.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 02.03.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.04.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.09.1997 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.1997 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   21.10.1997 | 12.09.1997 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.1997 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.1997 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.1997 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.1997 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   21.10.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH02215434 ; | [A]JPH02224721 ; | [A]JPH0492636 ; | [A]US2468934 (KLEYN TEUNIS P) [A] 1 * column 1, line 26 - column 3, line 12; figure - *; | [A]WO9110392 (ZENGERER HANS [AT]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE4107535 (YOO BYOUNG HYOUK [KR], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 24 - column 6, line 11; figure - *; | [A]DE9312156U (WAP REINIGUNGSSYSTEME [DE]) [A] 1 * page 2 - page 8; figure - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901115), vol. 14, no. 522, Database accession no. (C - 0778), & JP02215434 A 19900828 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901126), vol. 14, no. 535, Database accession no. (C - 0781), & JP02224721 A 19900906 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920714), vol. 16, no. 320, Database accession no. (C - 0962)<14>, & JP04092636 A 19920325 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |