EP0753601 - Coating apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.10.2001 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.12.2001 [2001/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Balzers und Leybold Deutschland Holding Aktiengesellschaft Wilhelm-Rohn-Strasse 25 63450 Hanau / DE | [1997/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beisswenger, Siegfried, Dr. Riemenschneiderstr. 3 D - 63755 Alzenau / DE | [1997/03] | Application number, filing date | 95111291.1 | 19.07.1995 | [1997/03] | Priority number, date | DE1995100964 | 14.07.1995 Original published format: DE 19500964 | [1997/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0753601 | Date: | 15.01.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0753601 | Date: | 21.10.1998 | [1998/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/56, C23C14/34 | [1997/03] | CPC: |
H01J37/32458 (EP);
C03C17/001 (EP);
C23C14/566 (EP);
C23C14/568 (EP);
H01J37/32743 (EP);
H01J37/32779 (EP);
H01J37/34 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1997/03] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Beschichten | [1997/03] | English: | Coating apparatus | [1997/03] | French: | Dispositif de revêtement | [1997/03] | Examination procedure | 06.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/01] | 11.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/49] | 28.06.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2001/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1997 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   20.10.1997 | 31.07.2001 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2171119 (BOC GROUP INC); | by applicant | DE4203473 |