EP0707106 - Composite elastic necked-bonded material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.01.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, WI 54956 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/13] | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | ||
Former [1997/50] | For all designated states Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, WI 54956 / US | ||
Former [1996/16] | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK CORPORATION 401 North Lake Street Neenah Wisconsin 54957-0349 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haffner, William Bela 1256 Tinderbox Lane Kennesaw, Georgia 30144 / US | 02 /
Morman, Michael Tod 555 Kings Peak Alpharetta, Georgia 30201 / US | 03 /
Taylor, Jack Draper 135 Big Creek Court Roswell, Georgia 30076 / US | 04 /
Tinsley, Jon Edward 1025 Windsor Trail Roswell, Georgia 30076 / US | [1996/16] | Representative(s) | Diehl & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Erika-Mann-Straße 9 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | Diehl & Partner Patentanwälte Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/16] | DIEHL GLAESER HILTL & PARTNER Flüggenstrasse 13 D-80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95111421.4 | 19.07.1995 | [1996/16] | Priority number, date | US19940276924 | 19.07.1994 Original published format: US 276924 | [1996/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0707106 | Date: | 17.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0707106 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | D04H13/00 | [1996/16] | CPC: |
B32B27/00 (EP);
B32B37/12 (KR);
B32B27/12 (EP,KR);
B32B37/0053 (KR);
B32B37/0076 (EP,KR);
B32B37/10 (KR);
B32B37/144 (EP,KR);
B32B38/1875 (EP,KR);
B32B5/022 (EP,KR);
B32B5/024 (EP,KR);
B32B5/026 (EP,KR);
B32B5/26 (EP,KR);
B32B7/02 (KR);
B32B7/05 (EP,KR);
B32B7/14 (EP,KR);
B32B2250/20 (EP,KR);
B32B2255/02 (EP,KR);
B32B2262/0253 (KR);
B32B2262/0261 (EP,KR);
B32B2262/0276 (EP,KR);
B32B2262/0292 (EP,KR);
B32B2262/067 (EP,KR);
B32B2264/02 (EP,KR);
B32B2307/51 (EP,KR);
B32B2307/54 (EP,KR);
B32B2307/546 (EP,KR);
B32B2307/718 (EP,KR);
B32B2307/726 (EP,KR);
B32B2309/02 (EP,KR);
B32B2309/12 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1996/16] | Title | German: | Elastisches, eingeschnürt gebundenes Verbundmaterial | [1996/16] | English: | Composite elastic necked-bonded material | [1996/16] | French: | Matériau composite élastique unit par étranglement | [1996/16] | Examination procedure | 09.10.1996 | Examination requested [1996/50] | 24.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 27.03.2002 | IT | 27.03.2002 | NL | 27.03.2002 | SE | 27.06.2002 | ES | 25.09.2002 | [2008/05] |
Former [2004/04] | BE | 27.03.2002 | |
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
ES | 25.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | BE | 27.03.2002 | |
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2002/37] | SE | 27.06.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO8000676 (FULLER H B CO [US]) [Y] 1-3,8,10,11,13-15 * page 10, line 7 - page 11, line 30 *; | [A]WO9003464 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [A] 1,2,9* page 4, line 25 - page 7, line 28 *; | [Y]WO9216366 (SABEE REINHARDT N [US]) [Y] 1-3,8,10,11,13-15 * page 7, line 15 * | by applicant | US3692618 | US3849241 | US4100324 | US4209563 | US4340563 | US4663220 | US4720415 | US4741949 | US4789699 | US4965122 | US4981747 |