EP0693384 - Thermal expansile sheet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.01.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.03.1999 [1999/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 15-1, Naeshiro-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/04] | For all designated states BROTHER KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 15-1, Naeshiro-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Imaeda, Mikio, c/o Brother Kogyo K.K. No. 15-1, Naeshiro-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [1996/04] | Representative(s) | Prüfer, Lutz H., et al PRÜFER & PARTNER GbR Patentanwälte Harthauser Strasse 25d 81545 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/04] | Prüfer, Lutz H., et al PRÜFER & PARTNER, Patentanwälte, Harthauser Strasse 25d D-81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95111457.8 | 20.07.1995 | [1996/04] | Priority number, date | JP19940169632 | 21.07.1994 Original published format: JP 16963294 | [1996/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0693384 | Date: | 24.01.1996 | [1996/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0693384 | Date: | 25.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B41M3/16, B41M5/38, B41M5/40, B41M5/36, G03G7/00 | [1996/04] | CPC: |
B41M5/52 (EP,US);
B41M3/06 (EP,US);
B41M3/16 (EP,US);
B41M5/46 (EP,US);
G03G7/00 (EP,US);
G03G7/002 (EP,US);
G09B21/02 (EP,US);
B41M5/465 (EP,US);
B41M5/504 (EP,US);
B41M5/508 (EP,US);
B41M5/5218 (EP,US);
B41M5/5227 (EP,US);
B41M5/5254 (EP,US);
Y10S428/913 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24736 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24802 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24942 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249953 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1996/04] | Title | German: | Wärmeempfindliche Expansionsschicht | [1996/04] | English: | Thermal expansile sheet | [1996/04] | French: | Feuille capable d'expansion par la chaleur | [1996/04] | Examination procedure | 14.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/33] | 07.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.09.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0376322 (MINOLTA CAMERA KK [JP]) [X] 1-15 * page 2, line 39 - line 44; figures 2A,2B; claims 1,2,5-8 * * page 3, line 11 - page 4, line 7 *; | [X]EP0034376 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 4, line 19 - page 5, line 23 * * figures 1-4; example 1; claims 1-6 *; | [XD]US4268615 (YONEZAWA YOSHIMICHI) [XD] 1-15 * column 1, line 23 - column 2, line 21 * * column 2, line 32 - column 3, line 32 * * figures 1A-1E; claim 1 * | by applicant | US4268615 | JPS6172589 |