EP0695755 - Pyrrolocarbazole [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/06] | Pyrrolocarbazoles | ||
[1998/43] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.1999 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.10.1999 [1999/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1998/43] | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG 4002 Basel / CH | ||
Former [1996/06] | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Broka, Chris Allen 821 Shell Boulevard Foster City, California 94404 / US | [1996/11] |
Former [1996/06] | 01 /
Broka, Chris Allen 821 Shell Boulevard Boulder, Colorado 80301 / US | Representative(s) | Witte, Hubert, et al F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG Patent Department (PLP) 124 Grenzacherstrasse 4070 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1998/26] | Witte, Hubert, et al F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG Patent Department (PLP), 124 Grenzacherstrasse 4070 Basel / CH | ||
Former [1996/06] | Grossner, Lutz, Dr. Grenzacher Strasse 124 Postfach 3255 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 95111472.7 | 21.07.1995 | [1996/06] | Priority number, date | US19940286043 | 04.08.1994 Original published format: US 286043 | [1996/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0695755 | Date: | 07.02.1996 | [1996/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0695755 | Date: | 21.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, A61K31/40, // (C07D487/04, 209:00, 209:00) | [1996/06] | CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07D487/06 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/06] | Title | German: | Pyrrolocarbazol | [1998/43] | English: | Pyrrolocarbazole | [1998/43] | French: | Pyrrolocarbazole | [1998/43] |
Former [1996/06] | Pyrrolocarbazole | ||
Former [1996/06] | Pyrrolocarbazoles | ||
Former [1996/06] | Pyrrolocarbazoles | Examination procedure | 21.07.1995 | Examination requested [1996/06] | 13.09.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 17.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.04.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/41] | Request for further processing for: | 23.09.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 23.09.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.10.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0269025 (BRISTOL MYERS CO [US]) [A] 1,6,9 * claims 1,7,12,14 *; | [A]EP0362695 (GOEDECKE AG [DE]) [A] 1,6,7,9 * examples 6,9,9c,9d,9g,9h *;; claims 1,3,4,79 *; | [A]WO9324491 (GOEDECKE AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,6 * page 17, line 24 - line 32; claims 1,15 *; | [AP]EP0624586 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [AP] 1,6 * claims 1,12 *; | [AP]WO9427982 (CEPHALON INC [US], et al) [AP] 1,9* claims 2,4 *; | [A] - D. TOULLEC ET AL., "The Bisindolylmaleimide ...", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 266, no. 24, pages 15771 - 15781, XP000572210 [A] 1 * page 15780, Fig. S.1 * | [AD] - J.A. EENKHOORN ET AL., "The Wittig Reaction of ...", CANADIAN JOURNAL OF CHEMISTRY, vol. 51, no. 5, pages 792 - 810 [AD] 7 | [A] - E. SCHRÖDER ET AL., Arzneimittelchemie I, STUTTGART, DE, GEORG THIEME VERLAG [A] * pages 24-38, especially page 33 * |