EP0693659 - Curative air conditioner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.05.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2000 | Refusal of application | published on 21.06.2000 [2000/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Metrax GmbH Rheinwaldstrasse 22 D-78628 Rottweil / DE | [1996/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bucher, Heinz Turmweg 44 D-786 28 Rottweil / DE | [1996/04] | Representative(s) | Fleck, Hermann-Josef Jeck, Fleck & partner mbB Patentanwälte Klingengasse 2 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/04] | Fleck, Hermann-Josef, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwälte A. Jeck & H.-J. Fleck Postfach 11 65 D-71697 Schwieberdingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 95111496.6 | 21.07.1995 | [1996/04] | Priority number, date | DE19944426218 | 23.07.1994 Original published format: DE 4426218 | [1996/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0693659 | Date: | 24.01.1996 | [1996/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0693659 | Date: | 11.06.1997 | [1997/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F24F3/12, F24F1/02, F24F6/12 | [1997/24] | CPC: |
A61L9/20 (EP);
F24F1/035 (EP,US);
A61H33/08 (EP);
F24F1/0071 (EP);
F24F3/12 (EP);
F24F8/10 (EP,US);
F24F8/22 (EP,US);
F24F1/06 (EP);
F24F1/08 (EP);
F24F6/00 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1996/04] | F24F3/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI [1996/04] | Title | German: | Heilklimagerät | [1996/04] | English: | Curative air conditioner | [1996/04] | French: | Appareil de climatisation thérapeutique | [1996/04] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1996/50: Teilanmeldung 96116225.2 eingereicht am 10/10/96 | EPB 1996/50: Divisional application 96116225.2 filed on 10/10/96 | EPB 1996/50: Demande divisionnaire 96116225.2 déposée le 10/10/96 | Examination procedure | 27.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/09] | 04.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.12.1999 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2000/25] | 18.01.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2000/25] | Divisional application(s) | EP96116225.2 / EP0763699 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 26.09.1995 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   23.10.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE3518456 (SCHUWERK FRITZ [DE], et al) [AD] 1 * page 10, line 7 - line 29; figure -; claim 1 *; | [A]DE3522946 (JUENGLING HELMUT) [A] 1 * column 2, line 16 - line 40; figure . *; | [A]EP0522439 (SCHUWERK FRITZ [DE], et al) [A] 1* figure .; claim 1 * | by applicant | DE3518456 |