|
23.12.2004 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
13 |
|
07.10.2004 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
09.09.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.09.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
07.09.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.09.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
06.09.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
19.08.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.04.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.2004 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.04.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.04.2004 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.04.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.04.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.04.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.03.2004 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
7 |
|
24.03.2004 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.10.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.10.2003 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.10.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
13.10.2003 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.10.2003 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.10.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
02.09.2003 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.08.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.08.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.2003 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.07.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.02.2003 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.2003 |
Composition of the board (only boards 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.02.2003 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
10.12.2002 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.2002 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.11.2002 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.11.2002 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.10.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.10.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
7 |
|
21.10.2002 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.10.2002 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.10.2002 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
21.10.2002 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.10.2002 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.08.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
31 |
|
19.08.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.08.2002 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
11 |
|
16.08.2002 |
Annex |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.2002 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
11 |
|
22.05.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.05.2002 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2002 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.04.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.04.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.2002 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.04.2002 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.2002 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.04.2002 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.06.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.05.2001 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
29.05.2001 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
27.04.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.04.2001 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2001 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.02.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.10.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.10.2000 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.10.2000 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.04.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2000 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
06.12.1999 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.1999 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.1999 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.10.1999 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.10.1999 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
27.10.1999 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
27.10.1999 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.12.1998 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.1998 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.1998 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.10.1998 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.07.1998 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.07.1998 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.1998 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.07.1998 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
02.07.1998 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.04.1998 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.04.1998 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.04.1998 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.1998 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.11.1997 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.1997 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.1997 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.01.1997 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.1997 |
Deletion of the entry relating to the representative ('et al' case) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.1996 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.06.1996 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.06.1996 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.02.1996 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.1996 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.11.1995 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.1995 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.1995 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
29.07.1995 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.1995 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.1995 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.07.1995 |
Description |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
22.07.1995 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.1995 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.1995 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |