EP0682930 - Absorbent article [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2001 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 30.07.2003 [2003/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, WI 54956 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | ||
Former [1997/50] | For all designated states Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | ||
Former [1997/49] | For all designated states Kimberley-Clark Worldwide, Inc. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | ||
Former [1995/47] | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK CORPORATION 401 North Lake Street Neenah, Wisconsin 54956-0349 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meyer, Stephen Carl 2853 Forest Chase Drive Marietta Georgia 30066 / US | 02 /
Lance, Roger Lynwood 3089 Thompson Mill Road Buford Georgia 30518 / US | 03 /
Hetzler, Connie Lynn 312 Congress Street Neenah WI 54956 / US | 04 /
Dunkerly II Cedric Arnett 1219 East Marquette Street Appleton WI 54911 / US | 05 /
Roessler, Thomas Harold 1034 Greendale Court Menasha WI 54952 / US | 06 /
Zenker, David Louis 1410 Ridgeway Court Neenah WI 54956 / US | 07 /
Sciaraffa, Michael Anthony 437 Churchill Road Appleton WI 54915 / US | [1995/47] | Representative(s) | Diehl, Hermann O. Th., et al Diehl & Partner GbR Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/47] | Diehl, Hermann, Dr. Dipl.-Phys., et al DIEHL, GLÄSER, HILTL & PARTNER Patentanwälte Flüggenstrasse 13 D-80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95112160.7 | 17.10.1988 | [1995/47] | Priority number, date | US19870109784 | 16.10.1987 Original published format: US 109784 | [1995/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0682930 | Date: | 22.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0682930 | Date: | 03.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/15, A61F13/46 | [1995/47] | CPC: |
A61F13/53747 (EP,US);
A61F13/512 (EP,US);
A61F13/5148 (EP,US);
A61F2013/15373 (EP,US);
A61F2013/15406 (EP,US);
A61F2013/15414 (EP,US);
A61F2013/15422 (EP,US);
A61F2013/15447 (EP,US);
A61F2013/15495 (EP,US);
A61F2013/15504 (EP,US);
A61F2013/51002 (EP,US);
A61F2013/51011 (EP,US);
A61F2013/51059 (EP,US);
A61F2013/51061 (EP,US);
A61F2013/51078 (EP,US);
A61F2013/5127 (EP,US);
A61F2013/51409 (EP,US);
A61F2013/51411 (EP,US);
A61F2013/51415 (EP,US);
A61F2013/51441 (EP,US);
A61F2013/530299 (EP,US);
A61F2013/530481 (EP,US);
A61F2013/530489 (EP,US);
A61F2013/530496 (EP,US);
A61F2013/53051 (EP,US);
A61F2013/530532 (EP,US);
A61F2013/5307 (EP,US);
A61F2013/530708 (EP,US);
A61F2013/530875 (EP,US);
A61F2013/530905 (EP,US);
A61F2013/530934 (EP,US);
A61F2013/53721 (EP,US);
A61F2013/53782 (EP,US);
A61F2013/53791 (EP,US);
A61F2013/53795 (EP,US);
A61F2013/8488 (EP,US);
A61F2013/8491 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1995/47] | Title | German: | Absorbierender Artikel | [1995/47] | English: | Absorbent article | [1995/47] | French: | Article absorbant | [1995/47] | Examination procedure | 02.08.1995 | Examination requested [1995/47] | 15.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.07.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP88117256.3 / EP0312118 | Divisional application(s) | EP00111185.5 / EP1046383 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 15.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 09.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 03.01.2001 | SE | 03.01.2001 | [2003/31] |
Former [2002/03] | BE | 03.01.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3371667 (MORSE EDWARD A) [Y] 1-5,14,21,24 * the whole document *; | [A]US4223677 (ANDERSON JAMES E); | [Y]EP0210968 (MOELNLYCKE AB [SE]) [Y] 1-5,14,21,24 * page 4, line 24 - page 5, line 27; figure -; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0212618 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) | by applicant | US3945386 | US3987792 | US4041951 | US4259958 | US4324247 | US4338371 | US4413032 | US4480000 | EP0165807 | GB2170108 |