EP0697218 - Method of preparing cross-linked biomaterial compositions for use in tissue augmentation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.09.2000 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.11.2000 [2000/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COLLAGEN CORPORATION 2500 Faber Place Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | [1996/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rhee, Woonza M. 3845 La Donna Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | 02 /
Berg, Richard A. 660 South Springer Road Los Altos, CA 94024 / US | 03 /
Rosenblatt, Joel S. 2651 South Court Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | 04 /
Schroeder, Jacqueline A. 1133 Woodrow Street Redwood City, CA 99204 / US | 05 /
Braga, Larry J. 1925U Barrymore Common Fremont, CA 94538 / US | 06 /
Smestad, Thomas L. 1023 Emerson Street Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | 07 /
Freeman, Abigal 43488 Jerome Avenue Fremont, CA 94539 / US | [1996/08] | Representative(s) | Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/09] | Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | ||
Former [1996/08] | Schwan, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Elfenstrasse 32 D-81739 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95112218.3 | 03.08.1995 | [1996/08] | Priority number, date | US19940287549 | 08.08.1994 Original published format: US 287549 | US19950497573 | 30.06.1995 Original published format: US 497573 | [1996/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0697218 | Date: | 21.02.1996 | [1996/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0697218 | Date: | 29.05.1996 | [1996/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/00, A61L25/00 | [1996/08] | CPC: |
C08H1/06 (EP,US);
A61K47/60 (EP,US);
A61K47/61 (EP,US);
A61L24/08 (EP,US);
A61L26/0033 (EP,US);
A61L27/18 (EP,US);
A61L27/20 (EP,US);
A61L27/24 (EP,US);
A61L27/34 (EP,US);
A61L27/44 (EP,US);
A61L31/042 (EP,US);
A61L31/044 (EP,US);
A61L31/125 (EP,US);
C07K14/495 (EP,US);
C07K14/78 (EP,US);
C08B37/0069 (EP,US);
C08B37/0072 (EP,US);
C08L89/06 (EP,US);
C09J189/06 (EP,US);
G02B1/043 (EP,US);
A61F2/07 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61L24/08, C08L5/00 (US,EP);
A61L27/18, C08L71/02 (US,EP);
A61L27/20, C08L5/00 (US,EP);
A61L27/34, C08L5/00 (US,EP);
A61L27/44, C08L89/06 (EP,US);
A61L31/042, C08L5/00 (EP,US);
A61L31/125, C08L89/06 (EP,US);
C08L89/06, C08L2666/02 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/08] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von vernetzten Biomaterialmischungen zum Gebrauch in Gewebevermehrung | [1996/08] | English: | Method of preparing cross-linked biomaterial compositions for use in tissue augmentation | [1996/08] | French: | Procédé pour préparer des compositions de biomatériaux réticulés destinées à l'augmentation de tissus | [1996/08] | Examination procedure | 29.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/04] | 15.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 26.05.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/46] | 21.06.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9005755 (COLLAGEN CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,4-14 * claim - *; | [A]EP0509833 (KOKEN KK [JP]) [A] 1* examples 1-5; claim - *; | [X]WO9401483 (COLLAGEN CORP [US]) [X] 1-4 * claim - *; | [D]US5292802 (RHEE WOONZA [US], et al); | [D]US5306500 (RHEE WOONZA [US], et al); | [DPX]EP0656214 (COLLAGEN CORP [US]) [DPX] 1-4 * page 15, line 36 - line 58; claim - *; | [DPX]EP0656215 (COLLAGEN CORP [US]) [DPX] 1-14 * examples 1-7; claim - * | by applicant | US5162430 | US5292802 | US5306500 | US5328955 | US19920984933 | US19930146843 | US19930147227 | US19940236769 |