EP0699517 - Feed pelleting press [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.08.1998 [1998/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bühler AG 9240 Uzwil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1996/10] | For all designated states BÜHLER AG CH-9240 Uzwil / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wetzel, Willi Sonnenbühl 1 CH-9240 Uzwil / CH | 02 /
Rhyner, Fritz Sonnenrainstrasse 10 CH-9243 Jonschwil / CH | 03 /
Beyer, Eduard Alpsteinstrasse 13 CH-9524 Zuzwil / CH | [1996/10] | Application number, filing date | 95112499.9 | 09.08.1995 | [1996/10] | Priority number, date | CH19940002630 | 29.08.1994 Original published format: CH 263094 | [1996/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0699517 | Date: | 06.03.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B30B11/20 | [1996/10] | CPC: |
B30B11/201 (EP);
B30B11/207 (EP);
B30B15/0082 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, GB, LI, NL [1996/10] | Title | German: | Futterwürfelpresse | [1996/10] | English: | Feed pelleting press | [1996/10] | French: | Presse à granuler des produits alimentaires | [1996/10] | Examination procedure | 24.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/12] | 03.03.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/35] | 01.04.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1998/35] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1997 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0127736 (WALTER ULRICH) [X] 1 * page 2, line 25 - page 3, line 2; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [X]GB285529 (WILLIAM DRYDEN) [X] 1 * page 4, line 122 - page 5, line 62; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [X]GB237944 (HENRY JOSEPH LONG DUNLOP) [X] 1 * page 3, line 27 - line 40; figure - *; | [X]FR1115893 (VINCENT) [X] 1 * figure - *; | [X]US3010150 (MEAKIN EDGAR N) [X] 1 * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 62; figure 1 *; | [X]FR1540660 (BELLEFROID) [X] 1 * page 2, line 34 - line 48; figure 2 *; | [DA]US3932091 (VINK JOHANNES ALBERTUS) [DA] 1 * column 5, line 67 - column 6, line 17; figure 2 *; | [A]US3191227 (KEEFE JAMES T) [A] 1 * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 6; figure 1 * | by applicant | DE2600648 | DE3121613 | EP0039961 |