EP0753338 - Method of and apparatus for agitating treatment liquid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.11.1999 [1999/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOKUSHU KIKA KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 16-43 Ebie 8-chome, Fukushima-ku Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/03] | For all designated states TOKUSHU KIKA KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 16-43 Ebie 8-chome, Fukushima-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Asa, Takeshi, c/o Tokushu Kika Kogyo K.K. 16-43, Ebie 8-chome, Fukushima-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | [1997/03] | Representative(s) | Melzer, Wolfgang, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/03] | Melzer, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner, Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95112534.3 | 09.08.1995 | [1997/03] | Priority number, date | JP19950173382 | 10.07.1995 Original published format: JP 17338295 | [1997/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0753338 | Date: | 15.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0753338 | Date: | 18.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B01F3/08, B01F15/06 | [1997/03] | CPC: |
B01F23/43 (EP,US);
B01F27/80 (KR);
B01F23/41 (EP,US);
B01F23/53 (EP,US);
B01F27/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1997/03] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Rühren von Behandlungsflüssigkeit | [1997/03] | English: | Method of and apparatus for agitating treatment liquid | [1997/03] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour l'agitation d'un liquide de traitement | [1997/03] | Examination procedure | 09.08.1995 | Examination requested [1997/03] | 12.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH0268123 ; | [A]JPS5759620 ; | [A]JPH0235924 ; | [Y]EP0124878 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-14 * figure -; claim - * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900529), vol. 14, no. 250, Database accession no. (C - 723)<4193>, & JP02068123 A 19900307 (KONICA CORP) [Y] 1-14 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820722), vol. 6, no. 135, Database accession no. (C - 115)<1013>, & JP57059620 A 19820410 (FUJI SHASHIN FILM) [A] 1,3 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900419), vol. 14, no. 192, Database accession no. (C - 711)<4135>, & JP02035924 A 19900206 (KONICA CORP) [A] 1,3 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH067913 |