EP0700235 - Process for patterning poly(arylenevinylene) polymer films by irradiation with light [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.2000 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.11.2000 [2000/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aventis Research & Technologies GmbH & Co. KG 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [1999/41] |
Former [1996/10] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Brüningstrasse 50 D-65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kang, Wen-Bing 3-12-2-103, Minamidai Kawagoe-shi, Saitama / JP | 02 /
Yu, Nu, Dr. 29-1-303, Wakitahonmachi Kawagoe-shi, Saitama / JP | 03 /
Tokida, Akihiko 3-1-117, Iseharacho Kawagoe-shi, Saitama / JP | [1996/10] | Application number, filing date | 95112829.7 | 16.08.1995 | [1996/10] | Priority number, date | JP19940203322 | 29.08.1994 Original published format: JP 20332294 | [1996/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0700235 | Date: | 06.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0700235 | Date: | 01.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H05B33/14, C09K11/06 | [1996/10] | CPC: |
C08G61/00 (EP,US);
H10K85/114 (EP,US);
C09K11/06 (EP,US);
H05B33/14 (EP,US);
H10K50/11 (EP,US);
H10K71/00 (US);
H10K71/40 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1996/10] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Strukturierung von Poly(arylenvinylen)-Polymerfilmen durch Lichtbestrahlung | [1996/10] | English: | Process for patterning poly(arylenevinylene) polymer films by irradiation with light | [1996/10] | French: | Procédé de structuration de films polymères de polyarylènevinylène par irradiation de lumière | [1996/10] | Examination procedure | 06.09.1996 | Examination requested [1996/45] | 11.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.02.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]WO9203491 (CAMBRIDGE RES & INNOVATION [GB], et al) [DA] 1,2,8* the whole document *; | [A]WO9314177 (CAMBRIDGE DISPLAY TECH LTD [GB]) [A] 1,2,8 * the whole document * | [A] - BURN P L ET AL, "Light-emitting diodes based on conjugated polymers: control of colour and efficiency", ELECTRICAL, OPTICAL, AND MAGNETIC PROPERTIES OF ORGANIC SOLID STATE MATERIALS SYMPOSIUM, BOSTON, MA, USA, 2-6 DEC. 1991, 1992, PITTSBURGH, PA, USA, MATER. RES. SOC, USA, pages 647 - 654 [A] 1,2,8 |