EP0759483 - Method for detecting foreign fibers in an opening machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.06.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.1998 [1998/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hergeth, Hubert, Dipl. Ing.-Dipl. Wirt. Ing. Lichtenbuscherstrasse 287 4731 Eynatten / BE | [1997/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/09] | Application number, filing date | 95112992.3 | 18.08.1995 | [1997/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0759483 | Date: | 26.02.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | D01G31/00, G01N33/36, G01N21/89 | [1997/09] | CPC: |
D01G31/003 (EP);
G01N33/362 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1997/09] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Erfassen von Fremdfasern an einer Öffnungsmaschine | [1997/09] | English: | Method for detecting foreign fibers in an opening machine | [1997/09] | French: | Procédé pour détecter des fibres étrangères dans un appareil d'ouverture | [1997/09] | Examination procedure | 27.08.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/31] | 25.02.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1998/31] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 02.12.1997 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1997 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP0606626 (ZELLWEGER USTER INC.) [Y] 1-3,5 * column 6, line 36 - column 10, line 49; figures 3-9 * [A] 7; | [Y]EP0399945 (H.-J. SCHEINHÜTTE) [Y] 1-3,5 * column 1, line 1 - line 11; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [Y]EP0379281 (COSMOPOLITAN TEXTILE CO. LTD.) [Y] 5 * column 2, line 54 - column 4, line 20; figure 1 *; | [A]FR2609058 (TRUTZSCHLER GMBH & CO KG) [A] 1 * page 3, line 23 - page 4, line 8; figure 1 *; | [A]DE4340173 (H. A. HERGETH) [A] 1,7 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]GB2210907 (HERGETH HOLLINGSWORTH GMBH) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE4206868 (H. TROPF) [A] 1 * column 2, line 20 - line 24; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | DE19951018783 |