EP0702489 - Control method for recording repetitively emitted broadcasts for a consumer electronics recording device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/12] | Conrol method for recording repetitively emitted transmissions for a recording device of the entertainment electronics art | ||
[1999/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2001 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
FR
GB
IT
NL
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | [2008/39] |
Former [2000/02] | For:FR
GB
IT
NL
AT
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | |||
Former [1997/05] | For:FR
GB
IT
NL
AT
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:DE
Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Röntgenstrasse 24 22335 Hamburg / DE | |||
Former [1996/12] | For:FR
GB
IT
NL
AT
Grundig E.M.V. Elektro-Mechanische Versuchsanstalt Max Grundig GmbH & Co. KG Kurgartenstrasse 37 D-90762 Fürth / DE | ||
For:DE
IR 3 Video International GmbH Beuthener Strasse 57 D-90471 Nürnberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dötzer, Artur IR 3 Video International GMBH, Beuthener Str. 57 D-90471 Nürnberg / DE | [1996/12] | Representative(s) | van der Kruk, Willem Leonardus Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1997/05] | van der Kruk, Willem Leonardus INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1996/12] | Langer, Andreas GRUNDIG E.M.V. Gewerblicher Rechtsschutz D-90748 Fürth / DE | Application number, filing date | 95113011.1 | 18.08.1995 | [1996/12] | Priority number, date | DE19944433033 | 16.09.1994 Original published format: DE 4433033 | [1996/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0702489 | Date: | 20.03.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0702489 | Date: | 30.07.1997 | [1997/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0702489 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/782 | [1996/12] | CPC: |
H04H20/28 (EP);
H04N5/782 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/12] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Steuerung der Aufzeichnung von wiederholt gesendeten Sendebeiträgen für ein Aufzeichnungsgerät der Unterhaltungselektronik | [1996/12] | English: | Control method for recording repetitively emitted broadcasts for a consumer electronics recording device | [1999/50] | French: | Procédé pour commander l'enregistrement d'émission répétées, pour un appareil d'enregistrement électronique grand public | [1999/50] |
Former [1996/12] | Conrol method for recording repetitively emitted transmissions for a recording device of the entertainment electronics art | ||
Former [1996/12] | Procédé pour commander l'enregistrement d'émissions répétées, pour un appareil d'enregistrement d'électronique d'amusement | Examination procedure | 30.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/14] | 26.11.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.03.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0571761 (GRUNDIG EMV [DE]) [A] 1,2 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 15 *; | [DA]EP0604871 (THOMSON BRANDT GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1,2 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 28 *; | [PA]EP0627857 (THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS [FR]) [PA] 1,2 * page 2, line 14 - line 43 *; | [DA] - HANS ENGELKAMP, "Fernsehen - total digital", RF-MAGAZIN FÜR UNTERHALTUNGS- UND KOMMUNIKATIONSELEKTRONIK, (199405), pages 10 - 14, XP000672325 [DA] 1,2 * Seite 13, Absatz 'Near-Video-On-Demand...' * |