EP0709987 - Bypass switching and messaging mechanism for providing intermix data transfer for a fiber optic switch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.07.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.09.1998 [1998/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states McData Corporation 310 Interlocken Parkway Broomfield Colorado 80021-3464 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/45] | For all designated states McData Corporation 310 Interlocken Parkway Broomfield, Colorado 80021-3464 / US | ||
Former [1996/18] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bennett, Dwayne R. 114 Red River Crescent Scarborough, ONT M1B 126 / CA | 02 /
Yeung, Clifford S. 156 Valleymede Drive Richmond Hill, ONT L4B 1X5 / CA | 03 /
Wu, Wayne 6 Kings Plate Crescent Rexdale, ONT M9W 6X6 / CA | [1996/18] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/18] | Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Georg-Kalb-Strasse 9 D-82049 Pullach / DE | Application number, filing date | 95113039.2 | 18.08.1995 | [1996/18] | Priority number, date | US19940332185 | 31.10.1994 Original published format: US 332185 | [1996/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0709987 | Date: | 01.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0709987 | Date: | 11.06.1997 | [1997/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56, G06F15/173, H04Q11/00 | [1997/21] | CPC: |
H04L49/357 (EP,US);
H04L49/3009 (EP,US);
H04L49/3027 (EP,US);
H04L49/351 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/18] | H04L12/56, G06F15/173 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/18] | Title | German: | Mechanismus zum Umschalten und zum Nachrichtenaustausch zur Erzeugung einer Mischdatenübertragung für einen Lichtleiterschalter | [1996/18] | English: | Bypass switching and messaging mechanism for providing intermix data transfer for a fiber optic switch | [1996/18] | French: | Mécanisme de contournement de commutation et de messagerie en vue de fournir divers transferts de données pour un commutateur à fibre optique | [1996/18] | Examination procedure | 13.01.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/36] | 09.04.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1998/36] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 26.01.1998 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1997 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   08.11.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0351729 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1-6 * page 1, line 1 - page 4, line 50 * * page 5, line 51 - page 6, line 21 * * page 7, line 46 - page 8, line 1 * * page 8, line 45 - page 9, line 19 ** abstract *; | [A]EP0366938 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document * |