EP0713283 - Supporting structure for an electric motor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.2001 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ebm Werke GmbH & Co. Bachmühle 2 74673 Mulfingen / DE | [1997/32] |
Former [1996/21] | For all designated states EBM ELEKTROBAU MULFINGEN GmbH & Co. Bachmühle 2 D-74673 Mulfingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wengrzik. Heinz Josef Michel Strasse 1 D-97980 Bad Mergentheim-Markelsheim / DE | [1996/21] | Representative(s) | Dr. Solf & Zapf Patent- und Rechtsanwalts PartG mbB Candidplatz 15 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/21] | Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Candidplatz 15 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95113115.0 | 21.08.1995 | [1996/21] | Priority number, date | DE19940018283U | 15.11.1994 Original published format: DE 9418283 U | [1996/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0713283 | Date: | 22.05.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0713283 | Date: | 21.08.1996 | [1996/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0713283 | Date: | 20.12.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H02K5/24, F16F15/08 | [1996/34] | CPC: |
H02K5/24 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1996/21] | H02K5/24 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1996/21] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Halterung eines Elektromotors | [1996/21] | English: | Supporting structure for an electric motor | [1996/21] | French: | Dispositif de support pour un moteur électrique | [1996/21] | Examination procedure | 16.10.1996 | Examination requested [1996/51] | 09.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.06.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 20.12.2000 | FR | 20.12.2000 | GB | 20.12.2000 | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/26] | ES | 20.12.2000 | |
GB | 20.12.2000 | ||
FR | 18.05.2001 | ||
Former [2002/12] | GB | 20.12.2000 | |
FR | 18.05.2001 | ||
Former [2002/10] | FR | 18.05.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US3509393 (RODDY JOSEPH T) [X] 1-4,6,8-10 * column 2, line 18 - column 4, line 24; figures 1-5 * [A] 5,11; | [XA]US3235653 (OSTROGNAI ALLEN G) [X] 1 * column 3, line 27 - column 5, line 29; figures 1-4 * [A] 3,4,6,8; | [XA]GB770102 (GEN ELECTRIC) [X] 1 * page 2, line 14 - page 3, line 38; figures 1-7 * [A] 3,4,6-9; | [XA]US2729846 (REED THOMAS W) [X] 1 * figures 1-3 * [A] 3,8; | [XA]US2296221 (PONTIS WILLIAM G) [X] 1,2 * figures 2,3 * [A] 8,9; | [A]EP0521313 (MULFINGEN ELEKTROBAU EBM [DE]) [A] 10 * figure 6 * | by applicant | DE1175785 |