EP0703384 - Vibration damper [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.01.2000 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2000 | Refusal of application | published on 15.03.2000 [2000/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ContiTech Formteile GmbH Wunstorfer Strasse 133 30453 Hannover / DE | [1998/38] |
Former [1996/13] | For all designated states Clouth Gummiwerke AG Niehler Strasse 102-106 D-50733 Köln / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gassen, Achim Landsbergstr. 35-37 D-50678 Köln / DE | 02 /
Vossenkuhl, Helmut Schwerinstr. 5 D-50733 Köln / DE | 03 /
Koos, Wolfgang Schloss-Str. 28 D-52066 Aachen / DE | [1996/13] | Representative(s) | von Samson-Himmelstjerna, Friedrich, et al Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/13] | von Samson-Himmelstjerna, Friedrich R., Dipl.-Phys., et al SAMSON & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 5 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95113131.7 | 21.08.1995 | [1996/13] | Priority number, date | DE19944431772 | 06.09.1994 Original published format: DE 4431772 | [1996/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0703384 | Date: | 27.03.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0703384 | Date: | 12.02.1997 | [1997/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F16F15/124 | [1996/13] | CPC: |
F16F7/1022 (EP,US);
F16F1/387 (EP,US);
F16F15/1442 (EP,US);
F16F7/108 (EP,US);
B60G2204/4104 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1996/13] | Title | German: | Schwingungstilger | [1996/13] | English: | Vibration damper | [1996/13] | French: | Amortisseur de vibrations | [1996/13] | Examination procedure | 06.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/19] | 22.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 01.10.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2000/11] | 11.10.1999 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2000/11] | Divisional application(s) | EP98123432.1 / EP0900950 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1997 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   14.11.1997 | 31.08.1999 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS62220736 ; | [A]DE934800 (GOETZEWERKE) [A] 1,19 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2228396 (MECANIQUE INDLE STE INTERNATIO [LU]) [A] 1,19 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2008714 (VOLKSWAGENWERK AG [DE]); | [A]FR2520072 (RENAULT [FR]); | [A]DE3335069 (GOETZE AG [DE]) [A] 1,19 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0300093 (FREUDENBERG CARL FA [DE]); | [A]DE3724963 (WOLF WOCO & CO FRANZ J [DE]) [A] 1,19 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880315), vol. 012, no. 081, Database accession no. (M - 676), & JP62220736 A 19870928 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] * abstract * | by applicant | DE2933586 | DE3937669 |