EP0759448 - Ionizing radiation-curable resin composition for optical article, optical article, and surface light source [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.12.2002 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: DE | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dainippon Printing Co., Ltd. 1-1, Kaga-cho 1-chome, Ichigaya, Shinjuku-ku Toyko / JP | For all designated states DAINIPPON INK AND CHEMICALS, INC. 35-58, Sakashita 3-chome Itabashi-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/09] | For all designated states Dainippon Printing Co., Ltd. 1-1, Kaga-cho 1-chome, Ichigaya, Shinjuku-ku Toyko / JP | ||
For all designated states DAINIPPON INK AND CHEMICALS, INC. 35-58, Sakashita 3-chome Itabashi-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nishio, Toshikazu, c/o Dainippon Printing Co., Ltd 1-1, Kaga-cho 1-chome, Ichigaya Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kojima, Hiroshi, c/o Dainippon Printing Co., Ltd 1-1, Kaga-cho 1-chome, Ichigaya Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Ishida, Hisanori c/o Dainippon Printing Co., Ltd 1-1, Kaga-cho 1-chome, Ichigaya Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Etou, Kazuko c/o Dainippon Printing Co., Ltd 1-1, Kaga-cho 1-chome, Ichigaya Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Amemiya, Hiroyuki, c/o Dainippon Printing Co., Ltd 1-1, Kaga-cho 1-chome, Ichigaya Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Takeuchi, Michiko, c/o Dainippon Printing Co., Ltd 1-1, Kaga-cho 1-chome, Ichigaya Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP | 07 /
Ichinose, Eiju 4-4, Higashi, Tatsumidai Ichihara-shi, Chiba / JP | 08 /
Abe, Youichi 5-23-8, Kimizuka Ichihara-shi, Chiba / JP | 09 /
Ishikawa, Hidenobu 6-5-4, Wakamiya Ichihara-shi, Chiba / JP | [1997/09] | Representative(s) | Kraus, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/09] | Kraus, Walter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95113163.0 | 22.08.1995 | [1997/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0759448 | Date: | 26.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0759448 | Date: | 30.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C08F290/06, G02B1/04, C09D4/06 | [1997/09] | CPC: |
G02B1/04 (EP,US);
C08F290/064 (EP,US);
Y10T428/21 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31938 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, NL [1997/09] | Title | German: | Durch ionisierende Strahlung härtbare Harzzusammmensetzung für optischen Gegenstand, optischer Gegenstand, und flächenartige Lichtquelle | [1997/09] | English: | Ionizing radiation-curable resin composition for optical article, optical article, and surface light source | [1997/09] | French: | Composition de résine durcissable par radiation ionisante pour article optique, article optique, et source lumineuse plane | [1997/09] | Examination procedure | 18.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/38] | 02.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 11.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2015/21] |
Former [2003/30] | DE | 01.05.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH06148880 ; | [A]EP0114982 (DESOTO INC [US]) [A] 1-5* claims 1-12 *; | [A]EP0156430 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1-7; | [X]EP0490704 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [X] 1 * claim 1 *; | [X]EP0631859 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 1 * claim 1 * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 94, no. 26, Database accession no. 94-211951, & JPH06148880 A 19940527 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS) [A] 1-7 * abstract * | by applicant | JPS4821546 | US2482598 | US2524862 | US3565978 | US3689346 | US3935359 | US4376800 | US4576850 | JPS6251725B | JPS6350066B | JPH0445681B | JPH04329501 | JPH05169015 | JPH0667004 |