EP0701926 - Multifunction control device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 11.06.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: GB | published on 06.09.2006 [2006/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT St.-Martin-Strasse 76 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/31] | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | ||
For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT St.-Martin-Strasse 76 81541 München / DE | |||
Former [1999/44] | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | ||
For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT St Martin Strasse 76 81541 München / DE | |||
Former [1996/12] | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft Postfach D-38436 Wolfsburg / DE | ||
For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT St Martin Strasse 76 D-81541 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ebner, Roland, Dipl.-Ing. Am Thiergarten 21 D-93170 Bernhardswald / DE | 02 /
Eichmann, Falk, Dipl.-Ing. Nelkenweg 2 D-38302 Wolfenbüttel / DE | 03 /
Spreitzer, Wilhelm, Dipl.-Ing. Isonzostrasse 44 D-93057 Regensburg / DE | 04 /
Nitzsche, Ulf, Dr. Rehnekamp 32 D-38108 Braunschweig / DE | 05 /
Foerster, Robert, Dipl.-Ing. Friedenstrasse 1 D-93086 Wörth / DE | [1996/12] | Application number, filing date | 95113427.9 | 26.08.1995 | [1996/12] | Priority number, date | DE19944432527 | 13.09.1994 Original published format: DE 4432527 | [1996/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0701926 | Date: | 20.03.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0701926 | Date: | 15.04.1998 | [1998/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0701926 | Date: | 03.11.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/44] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0701926 | Date: | 28.07.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B60R16/02 | [1996/12] | CPC: |
B60R16/0231 (EP,US);
B60K35/00 (EP);
B60K35/10 (EP,US);
G01C21/3664 (EP);
B60K2360/11 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1996/12] | Title | German: | Multifunktions-Bedieneinrichtung | [1996/12] | English: | Multifunction control device | [1996/12] | French: | Dispositif de commande multifonctions | [1996/12] | Examination procedure | 15.10.1998 | Examination requested [1998/50] | 25.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.04.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
25.07.2000
09.08.2000
ADMISSIBLE Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte GmbH Schutzrechtsverwertung & Co. KG Bahnstrasse 62 40210 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Eichstädt, Alfred Maryniok GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät Leibnizstrasse 6 95447 Bayreuth / DE | 02
03.08.2000
ADMISSIBLE Robert Bosch GmbH Abteilung ZGE2 -Slickers Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/39] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.07.2000
09.08.2000
ADMISSIBLE Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte GmbH Schutzrechtsverwertung & Co. KG Bahnstrasse 62 40210 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Eichstädt, Alfred, Dipl.-Ing. Maryniok & Eichstädt, Kuhbergstrasse 23 96317 Kronach / DE | ||
02
03.08.2000
ADMISSIBLE Robert Bosch GmbH Abteilung ZGE2 -Slickers Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | |||
Former [2000/38] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.07.2000
ADMISSIBLE Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte GmbH Schutzrechtsverwertung & Co. KG Bahnstrasse 62 40210 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Eichstädt, Alfred, Dipl.-Ing. Maryniok & Eichstädt, Kuhbergstrasse 23 96317 Kronach / DE | 07.09.2000 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 18.01.2001 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 28.06.2001 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.07.2001 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 26.07.2001 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 11.11.2003 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 11.11.2003 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 16.02.2004 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 26.05.2004 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 03.08.2001 | Appeal received No. T0938/01 | 15.11.2001 | Statement of grounds filed | 11.11.2003 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 11.11.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.12.2003 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2006/36] |
Former [2005/46] | GB | 03.11.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3737087 (KIRSTEN ELEKTROTECH [DE]) [Y] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4033574 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2,7-16 * column 3, line 55 - column 5, line 5; figures 2,3 *; | [Y]US5017916 (LONDT EDWARD E [US], et al) [Y] 1-16 * column W *; | [A]DE9301031U (BEILHACK MASCHF MARTIN [DE]) [A] 1-16* the whole document * | Examination | EP0057892 | DE3514438 | DE3628333 | DE3702539 | EP0366132 | US5239700 | - Bedienungsanleitung Berlin RCM 303A, Blaupunkt Werke GmbH 4/94 | - "Der grosse Unterschied im Automobil: Berlin RCM 303A"Blaupunkt Werke GmbH, äussere Umschlagsseiten | - "Berlin-Händler, Berlin-Systemspezialisten" 30.05.1994, Internes Dokument (Auszug), Blaupunkt-Werke GmbH | - Rechnung an die Franz Bauer GmbH & Co., 84428 Buchbach, vom 29.06.1994 | by applicant | EP0366132 |