|
10.08.2005 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2005 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2005 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.07.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.07.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.07.2005 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2005 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2005 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2005 |
N/A |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.04.2005 |
N/a |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.04.2005 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
12 |
|
19.04.2005 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.2005 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
20 |
|
18.04.2005 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2005 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
5 |
|
03.03.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
11.02.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.02.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.02.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
03.02.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.02.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.02.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.01.2005 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.01.2005 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.01.2005 |
Description |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.01.2005 |
Description |
Appeal |
5 |
|
28.01.2005 |
Drawings |
Appeal |
6 |
|
28.01.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
01.12.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.11.2004 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
11 |
|
23.11.2004 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.2004 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.10.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.10.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.10.2004 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.2004 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.06.2004 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.05.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
14.04.2004 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
3 |
|
01.04.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.03.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2004 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.02.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.02.2004 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.01.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.01.2004 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.12.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.11.2003 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.10.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.10.2003 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.09.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.09.2003 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.06.2003 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.06.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.06.2003 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
03.06.2003 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
03.06.2003 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
35 |
|
23.05.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.04.2003 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.04.2003 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.03.2003 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.03.2003 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.02.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.01.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.2003 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.01.2003 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
30.01.2003 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.01.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.01.2003 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.01.2003 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.2003 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
30.01.2003 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.01.2003 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.10.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.10.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
15.10.2002 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
13 |
|
15.10.2002 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.09.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.2002 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.09.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
11.09.2002 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.11.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2001 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.11.2001 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2001 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2001 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.06.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2001 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
27.03.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2001 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2000 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2000 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2000 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.10.2000 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.10.2000 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
26.10.2000 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.10.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
26.10.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
26.10.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
26.10.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
26.10.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
58 |
|
16.12.1999 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.1999 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.1999 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.10.1999 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.09.1999 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.1999 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.07.1999 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.1999 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.07.1999 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
15.06.1999 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.04.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
03.04.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.04.1999 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.04.1999 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.03.1999 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.1999 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.1998 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.07.1998 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.1998 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.1998 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.1998 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.05.1998 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.05.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.1998 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.01.1996 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.1996 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.08.1995 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.08.1995 |
Description |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
31.08.1995 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.1995 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
31.08.1995 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
31.08.1995 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |