EP0702155 - Pump for hot and corrosive fluids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.10.2002 [2002/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [2001/45] |
Former [1996/12] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dummersdorf, Hans-Ulrich, Dr. Ahornweg 15a D-51399 Burscheid / DE | 02 /
Waldmann, Helmut, Dr. Henry-T.-v-Böttinger-Str. 15 D-51373 Leverkusen / DE | 03 /
Härle, Helmut, Dr. Thomas-Morus-Str. 2 D-51375 Leverkusen / DE | 04 /
Minz, Franz-Rudolf, Dr. Hans-Sachs-Str. 14 D-41542 Dormagen / DE | 05 /
Gestermann, Fritz, Dr. Berliner Str. 83 D-51377 Levekusen / DE | [1996/12] | Application number, filing date | 95113673.8 | 31.08.1995 | [1996/12] | Priority number, date | DE19944432551 | 13.09.1994 Original published format: DE 4432551 | [1996/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0702155 | Date: | 20.03.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0702155 | Date: | 08.01.1997 | [1997/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0702155 | Date: | 07.11.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F04C13/00, F04C15/00 | [1996/12] | CPC: |
F04C15/0096 (EP,US);
F04C15/0069 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1996/12] | Title | German: | Pumpe zur Förderung heisser, korrosiver Medien | [1996/12] | English: | Pump for hot and corrosive fluids | [1996/12] | French: | Pompe pour fluides chauds et corrosifs | [1996/12] | Examination procedure | 08.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/37] | 16.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 23.11.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 28.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/44] | Request for further processing for: | 28.12.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 22.12.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.01.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0590777 (TUTHILL CORP [US]) [Y] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [Y]US4958988 (REGEV MORDECHAI [IL]) [Y] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE4212982 (LEDERLE PUMPEN & MASCHF [DE]) [DA] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0499504 (BERTIN & CIE [FR]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]US5263825 (DOOLIN JOHN H [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE9307447U (FRIATEC-RHEINHÜTTE GMBH & CO.) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]DE8909636U (LEYBOLD AG) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3536092 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]US4792244 (YAMASHITA YUKO [JP], et al) [A] 3 * the whole document *; | [A]DE1286825 (CARBORUNDUM CO) [A] 3 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3922279 (TOSHIBA KAWASAKI KK [JP]) [A] 3,4 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE8711555U | DE4212982 |