EP0703580 - Information reproducing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/13] | Information reproducing device and information recording medium | ||
[2000/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Optical Co., Ltd. 43-2, 2-chome, Hatagaya Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/46] | For all designated states Olympus Optical Co., Ltd. 43-2, 2-chome, Hatagaya Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | ||
Former [1996/13] | For all designated states OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO., LTD. 43-2, 2-chome, Hatagaya Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sasaki, Hiroshi, c/o Int. Prop. & Legal Depart. Olympus Optical Co.,Ltd., 2-3 Kuboyama-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Yunoki, Yutaka, c/o Int. Prop. & Legal Depart. Olympus Optical Co.,Ltd., 2-3 Kuboyama-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Fujimori, Hiroyoshi, c/o Int. Prop. & Legal Depart Olympus Optical Co.,Ltd., 2-3 Kuboyama-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Imade, Shinichi, c/o Int. Prop. & Legal Depart. Olympus Optical Co.,Ltd., 2-3 Kuboyama-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Matsui, Shinzo, c/o Int. Prop. & Legal Depart. Olympus Optical Co.,Ltd., 2-3 Kuboyama-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Mori, Takeshi, c/o Int. Prop. & Legal Depart. Olympus Optical Co.,Ltd., 2-3 Kuboyama-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo / JP | [1996/13] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/13] | KUHNEN, WACKER & PARTNER Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 D-85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 95113716.5 | 31.08.1995 | [1996/13] | Priority number, date | JP19940211433 | 05.09.1994 Original published format: JP 21143394 | [1996/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0703580 | Date: | 27.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0703580 | Date: | 24.02.1999 | [1999/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0703580 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/10, G06K19/06, G11B7/00 | [1999/08] | CPC: |
G06K7/1473 (EP,US);
G06K7/14 (EP,US);
G09B5/062 (EP,US);
G11B20/10 (EP,US);
G11B20/1866 (EP,US);
G11B27/102 (EP,US);
G11B27/3027 (EP,US);
G11B27/327 (EP,US);
G11B7/0033 (EP,US);
G11B7/013 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1996/13] | G11B20/10, G11B20/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/13] | Title | German: | Informationswiedergabegerät | [2000/50] | English: | Information reproducing device | [2000/50] | French: | Dispositif de reproduction d'information | [2000/50] |
Former [1996/13] | Informationswiedergabegerät und Informationsaufzeichnungsmedium | ||
Former [1996/13] | Information reproducing device and information recording medium | ||
Former [1996/13] | Dispositif de reproduction d'information et milieu d'enregistrement d'information | Examination procedure | 31.08.1995 | Examination requested [1996/13] | 03.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 16.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 29.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.11.2001 | BE | 14.11.2001 | CH | 14.11.2001 | GR | 14.11.2001 | IT | 14.11.2001 | LI | 14.11.2001 | NL | 14.11.2001 | DK | 14.02.2002 | PT | 14.02.2002 | SE | 14.02.2002 | ES | 30.05.2002 | [2008/05] |
Former [2004/04] | AT | 14.11.2001 | |
BE | 14.11.2001 | ||
CH | 14.11.2001 | ||
GR | 14.11.2001 | ||
LI | 14.11.2001 | ||
NL | 14.11.2001 | ||
DK | 14.02.2002 | ||
PT | 14.02.2002 | ||
SE | 14.02.2002 | ||
ES | 30.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 14.11.2001 | |
BE | 14.11.2001 | ||
CH | 14.11.2001 | ||
GR | 14.11.2001 | ||
LI | 14.11.2001 | ||
NL | 14.11.2001 | ||
DK | 14.02.2002 | ||
PT | 14.02.2002 | ||
SE | 14.02.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 14.11.2001 | |
BE | 14.11.2001 | ||
CH | 14.11.2001 | ||
GR | 14.11.2001 | ||
LI | 14.11.2001 | ||
NL | 14.11.2001 | ||
PT | 14.02.2002 | ||
SE | 14.02.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | BE | 14.11.2001 | |
CH | 14.11.2001 | ||
GR | 14.11.2001 | ||
LI | 14.11.2001 | ||
NL | 14.11.2001 | ||
PT | 14.02.2002 | ||
SE | 14.02.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | CH | 14.11.2001 | |
GR | 14.11.2001 | ||
LI | 14.11.2001 | ||
PT | 14.02.2002 | ||
SE | 14.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/49] | GR | 14.11.2001 | |
PT | 14.02.2002 | ||
SE | 14.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/48] | PT | 14.02.2002 | |
SE | 14.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/26] | SE | 14.02.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH06231466 ; | [A]JPS62289936 ; | [A]US4461552 (LEVINE ARNOLD M [US]); | [A]US5101096 (OHYAMA SHINJI [JP], et al) [A] 1,24 * abstract * * column 1, line 49 - column 2, line 7 * * column 4, line 22 - column 5, line 35 *; | [AD]WO9408314 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO [JP], et al) [AD] 1,2,6,10-13,15; | EP0670555 [ ] (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO [JP]) [ ] * column 2, line 25 - column 5, line 23 * * column 12, line 25 - line 53 * * column 15, line 4 - column 16, line 39 * * column 57, line 8 - column 59, line 25 * * figure 2A *; | [E]EP0713194 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO [JP]) [E] 1,2,6,7,9,12-14,24 * the whole document *; | [E]EP0773511 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO [JP]) [E] 1-3,6,7,9,10,24 * column 2, line 11 - column 3, line 20 * * column 6, line 25 - column 11, line 14 * * column 18, line 49 - column 19, line 52 ** figures 1-3; claims 9-27 *; | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941124), vol. 018, no. 618, Database accession no. (P - 1831), & JP06231466 A 19940819 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO LTD) [A] 1,2,24 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880527), vol. 012, no. 180, Database accession no. (P - 709), & JP62289936 A 19871216 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO) [A] 1,2,6,9,24 * abstract * | [A] - SHINJI OHYAMA ET AL, "OPTICAL SHEET MEMORY SYSTEM", ELECTRONICS & COMMUNICATIONS IN JAPAN, PART II - ELECTRONICS, New York, US, (19920401), vol. 75, no. 4, pages 73 - 84, XP000312135 [A] 1,2,6,9,24 * the whole document * |