EP0699653 - Method for the preparation of amines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.1998 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.12.1998 [1998/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [1998/02] |
Former [1996/10] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dingerdissen, Uwe, Dr. Weedring 66 D-64342 Seeheim-Jugenheim / DE | 02 /
Lauth, Günter, Prof. Dr. Stephensonstr. 3 D-23562 Lübeck / DE | 03 /
Henne, Andreas, Dr. Adolf-Kolping-Str. 137a D-67433 Neustadt / DE | 04 /
Stops, Peter Limburgstr. 12 D-67122 Altrip / DE | 05 /
Eller, Karsten, Dr. Deutsche Str. 19 D-67059 Ludwigshafen / DE | 06 /
Gehrer, Eugen, Dr. Londoner Ring 70 D-67069 Ludwigshafen / DE | [1996/10] | Application number, filing date | 95113737.1 | 01.09.1995 | [1996/10] | Priority number, date | DE19944431093 | 01.09.1994 Original published format: DE 4431093 | [1996/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0699653 | Date: | 06.03.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0699653 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C07C209/60, C07C211/07, C07C211/35 | [1996/10] | CPC: |
C07C211/35 (EP,US);
C07C209/60 (EP,US);
C07C211/07 (EP,US);
C07C2601/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1996/10] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Aminen | [1996/10] | English: | Method for the preparation of amines | [1996/10] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation des amines | [1996/10] | Examination procedure | 12.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/11] | 11.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.05.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9317995 (AKZO NV [NL]) [A] 1,2 * example -; claim - *; | [A]EP0039918 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]) [A] 1,2 * example -; claim -; tables 1,1A,1AA *; | [DA]EP0132736 (BASF AG [DE]) [DA] 1,2 * das ganze Dokument *; | [DA]EP0133938 (BASF AG [DE]) [DA] 1,2 * example -; claim - *; | [DA]DE3634247 (BASF AG) [DA] 1,2 * das ganze Dokument * | by applicant | DE3326579 | DE3327000 | DE3634247 | - APPL. CATAL., (1984), vol. 12, pages 327 - 357 | - CHEMTECH, (1993), pages 26 - 31 | - J. AMER. CHEM. SOC., (1938), vol. 50, pages 309 - 319 | - J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1940), vol. 62, page 1723 | - J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1932), vol. 54, page 2721 |