EP0700156 - Beamformer using coefficient restrained adaptive filters for cancelling interference signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/10] | Beamformer using coefficient restrained adaptive filters for detecting interference signals | ||
[2001/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2003 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/23] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1996/10] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoshuyama, Osamu c/o NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1996/10] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/10] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95113764.5 | 01.09.1995 | [1996/10] | Priority number, date | JP19940208635 | 01.09.1994 Original published format: JP 20863594 | [1996/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0700156 | Date: | 06.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0700156 | Date: | 03.09.1997 | [1997/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0700156 | Date: | 05.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H03H21/00, H01Q3/26 | [1997/36] | CPC: |
H04R3/005 (EP,US);
H03H21/0012 (EP,US);
H04R2430/25 (EP,US);
Y10S367/901 (EP);
Y10S367/905 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1996/10] | H03H21/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1996/10] | Title | German: | Bündelerreger mit adaptiven Filtern mit beschränkten Koeffizienten zur Unterdrückung von Interferenzsignalen | [2001/31] | English: | Beamformer using coefficient restrained adaptive filters for cancelling interference signals | [2001/31] | French: | Dispositif pour former des faisceaux utilisant des filtres adaptatifes à coefficients limités pour la suppression de signaux parasites | [2001/31] |
Former [1996/10] | Bündelerreger mit adaptiven Filtern mit beschränkten Koeffizienten zur Detektion von Interferenzsignalen | ||
Former [1996/10] | Beamformer using coefficient restrained adaptive filters for detecting interference signals | ||
Former [1996/10] | Dispositif pour former des faisceaux utilisant des filtres adaptatifes à coefficients limités pour détection de signaux parasites | Examination procedure | 24.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/39] | 11.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 20.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 18.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5329472 (SUGIYAMA AKIHIKO [JP]) [A] 1,3,5 * column 9, line 20 - line 50; figure 6 *; | [A] - KO C C ET AL, "A ROBUST SOURCE TRACKING ALGORITHM FOR PARTIALLY ADAPTIVE ARRAYS", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ELECTRONICS, (19931101), vol. 75, no. 5, pages 951 - 964, XP000422094 [A] 1 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0004]; figures 1-3 * | [DA] - CLAESSON I ET AL, "A SPATIAL FILTERING APPROACH TO ROBUST ADAPTIVE BEAMING", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION, (19920901), vol. 40, no. 9, pages 1093 - 1096, XP000321785 [DA] 1,3,5 * paragraph [000I] * * paragraph [II.A] * * paragraph [II.A] * * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/8.166535 | [DA] - GRIFFITHS L J ET AL, "AN ALTERNATIVE APPROACH TO LINEARLY CONSTRAINED ADAPTIVE BEAMFORMING", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION, (198201), vol. AP-30, no. 1, pages 27 - 34, XP000608836 [DA] 1 * page 29, column L, line 48 - page 30, column R, line 40; figure 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TAP.1982.1142739 |