EP0703498 - Photosensitive resin composition and method for forming a photoresist pattern [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.12.1998 [1998/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CORPORATION 5-2 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/13] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CORPORATION 5-2 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nishi, Mineo, Kurosaki Dev.Center Mitsubishi Chem.Corp., 11 Kurosakishiroishi Yahatanishi-ku, Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka / JP | 02 /
Nakano, Koji, Kurosaki Dev.Center Mitsubishi Chem.Corp., 11 Kurosakishiroishi Yahatanishi-ku, Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka / JP | 03 /
Ikemoto, Makoto, Kurosaki Dev.Center Mitsubishi Chem.Corp., 11 Kurosakishiroishi Yahatanishi-ku, Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka / JP | 04 /
Kusumoto, Tadashi, Kurosaki Dev.Center Mitsubishi Chem.Corp., 11 Kurosakishiroishi Yahatanishi-ku, Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka / JP | 05 /
Kawase, Yasuhiro, Kurosaki Dev.Center Mitsubishi Chem.Corp., 11 Kurosakishiroishi Yahatanishi-ku, Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka / JP | [1996/13] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/13] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95113937.7 | 05.09.1995 | [1996/13] | Priority number, date | JP19940213927 | 07.09.1994 Original published format: JP 21392794 | [1996/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0703498 | Date: | 27.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0703498 | Date: | 29.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/022, G03F7/004 | [1996/13] | CPC: |
G03F7/0226 (EP,US);
G03F7/00 (KR);
G03F7/0045 (EP,US);
G03F7/022 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1996/13] | Title | German: | Fotoempfindliche Harzzusammensetzung und Verfahren zur Herstellung von Fotoresistmustern | [1996/13] | English: | Photosensitive resin composition and method for forming a photoresist pattern | [1996/13] | French: | Composition à base de résine photosensible et procédé de fabrication de motifs à partir de cette photoréserve | [1996/13] | Examination procedure | 05.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/36] | 20.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.03.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JPH05323598 [ ] (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [A]US5215856 (JAYARAMAN TRIPUNITHURA V [US]) [A] 1-11 * column 5, line 47 - line 65; claim - *; | [AD]US5204218 (KUMADA TERUHIKO [US], et al) [AD] 1-11 * column 3, line 10 - line 39; claim - * | [AD] - M. NUNOMURA ET AL., "Positive-working photoresist compositions and resist pattern formation", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19940613), vol. 120, no. 24, Database accession no. 311598, page 899 [AD] 1-11 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH04330444 | JPH05323598 | JPH07104473 | JPH063544 | JPH02269351 | JPH0348249 |