EP0709921 - Interconnection strip for transverse distribution of electric power [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.1999 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.06.1999 [1999/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Weidmüller Interface GmbH & Co. KG Paderborner Strasse 175 32760 Detmold / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/18] | For all designated states Weidmüller Interface GmbH & Co. Paderborner Strasse 175 D-32760 Detmold / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hanning, Walter Am Langen Grund 66 D-32758 Detmold / DE | 02 /
Schnatwinkel, Michael Schmiedestrasse 39 D-32051 Herford / DE | 03 /
Wilmes, Manfred Ellernbruchweg 19 D-32760 Detmold / DE | [1996/18] | Representative(s) | Stracke, Alexander, et al Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/18] | Stracke, Alexander, Dipl.-Ing., et al Jöllenbecker Strasse 164 D-33613 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 95113953.4 | 06.09.1995 | [1996/18] | Priority number, date | DE19944438802 | 31.10.1994 Original published format: DE 4438802 | [1996/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0709921 | Date: | 01.05.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0709921 | Date: | 24.06.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H01R9/26 | [1996/18] | CPC: |
H01R9/2675 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1996/18] | Title | German: | Verteilerleisten mit Querverteilung der elektrischen Leistung (II) | [1996/18] | English: | Interconnection strip for transverse distribution of electric power | [1996/18] | French: | Barrette d'interconnexion pour repartition transversale de puissance | [1996/18] | Examination procedure | 04.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/18] | 29.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4469128 (PETRIMAUX ERIC [FR], et al); | [A]US4487464 (KIRSCHENBAUM BERNARD [US]); | [A]DE3422800 (WAGO VERWALTUNGS GMBH [DE]) | Examination | EP0222030 | by applicant | DE3048497 | EP0222030 | DE68912040T | DE4322535 |