EP0703189 - Method for purifying hydrogen peroxide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.10.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.12.1999 [1999/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KEMIRA CHEMICALS OY P.O. Box 330 00101 Helsinki / FI | [1998/50] |
Former [1996/13] | For all designated states KEMIRA CHEMICALS OY P.O. Box 330 SF-00101 Helsinki / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Turunen, Ilkka Ohjastie 1 C 2 FI-90540 Oulu / FI | [1996/13] | Representative(s) | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/26] | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | ||
Former [1996/13] | Weitzel, Wolfgang, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwalt Friedenstrasse 10 D-89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 95114090.4 | 08.09.1995 | [1996/13] | Priority number, date | FI19940004373 | 21.09.1994 Original published format: FI 944373 | [1996/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0703189 | Date: | 27.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0703189 | Date: | 09.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C01B15/013 | [1996/13] | CPC: |
B01D11/0407 (EP,US);
C01B15/013 (EP,US);
Y02P20/54 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1996/13] | Title | German: | Methode zur Reinigung von Wasserstoffperoxid | [1996/13] | English: | Method for purifying hydrogen peroxide | [1996/13] | French: | Méthode de purification de péroxyde d'hydrogène | [1996/13] | Examination procedure | 02.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/35] | 24.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1412812 (LAPORTE CHEMICAL) [A] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - E. J. SHIMSHICK, "Extraction with supercritical CO2", CHEMTECH, pages 374 - 375 [A] 1-3,5,6 * the whole document * | [A] - SANG-DO YEO, AYDIN AKGERMAN, "Supercritical extraction of organic mixtures from aqueous solutions", AICHE JOURNAL, vol. 36, no. 11, pages 1743 - 1747 [A] 1,5,6 * the whole document * |