EP0703320 - Manual guide frame for compactor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.06.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2001 | Refusal of application | published on 18.07.2001 [2001/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Diehl Remscheid GmbH & Co. Vieringhausen 118 D-42857 Remscheid / DE | [1996/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoffmann, Wolfgang Im Bungert 8 D-53945 Blankenheim-Alendorf / DE | 02 /
Pepping, Karl-Heinz Egelstr. 3 D-53937 Schleiden / DE | 03 /
Hausmann, Franz-Hubert Sternenbergstr. 60 D-53894 Mechernich / DE | [1996/13] | Representative(s) | Hofmann, Gerhard, et al Patentassessor Stephanstrasse 49 90478 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/13] | Hofmann, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Patentassessor, et al Stephanstrasse 49 D-90478 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 95114091.2 | 08.09.1995 | [1996/13] | Priority number, date | DE19944433243 | 19.09.1994 Original published format: DE 4433243 | DE1995111738 | 31.03.1995 Original published format: DE 19511738 | [1996/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0703320 | Date: | 27.03.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0703320 | Date: | 16.10.1996 | [1996/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | E02D3/046, E01C19/35, B25G1/01, B25F5/02 | [1996/13] | CPC: |
E02D3/046 (EP);
B25F5/006 (EP);
E01C19/35 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, SE [1996/13] | Title | German: | Führungsrahmen mit Handführung für Verdichter | [1996/13] | English: | Manual guide frame for compactor | [1996/13] | French: | Cadre de guidage manuel pour compacteur | [1996/13] | Examination procedure | 09.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/19] | 18.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.02.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2001/29] | 23.02.2001 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2001/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2000 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3416417 (MCILRATH WILLIAM P, et al) [X] 1-3,5 * column 3, line 20 - line 41; figure - * [Y] 4; | [X]US2737094 (CORWILL JACKSON) [X] 1-3,5 * column 2, line 35 - line 44; figures 1-4 *; | [XA]GB1018746 (EBERHARD DORNFELD) [X] 1,2,5 * page 2, line 45 - page 5, line 66; figure - * [A] 3,4; | [XA]NL6513555 (LOSENHAUSENWEK DÜSSELDORFER MASCHINENBAU AG.) [X] 1,2,5 * page 3, line 8 - page 4, line 12; figure - * [A] 3; | [DX]DE2241692 (KOEHRING CO) [DX] 1-3,5 * page 7, line 14 - page 9, line 31; figures 3-5 *; | [Y]EP0455618 (ATLAS COPCO TOOLS AB [SE]) [Y] 4 * column A; figure - *; | [A]DE3304849 (M S GIKEN CO [JP], et al) [A] 4 * abstract *; | [A]EP0128128 (TRELLEBORG AB [SE]) [A] 1,2,6 * page 3, line 29 - page 9, line 37; figure - *; | [A]DE3121882 (HITACHI KOKI KK [JP]) [A] 6 * page 7, line 17 - page 12, line 10; figure - *; | [A]EP0057166 (BYGGERGONOMILABORATORIET AB [SE]) [A] 6 * page 3, line 8 - page 5, line 25; figures 1-6 *; | [A]US5054562 (HONSA THOMAS W [US], et al) | by applicant | DE2241692 |