EP0702405 - A pneumatically coupled heat sink assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.2004 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.05.2004 [2004/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | [1996/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Widmayer, Robert B. 5206 Iris Lane Harvard, Illinois 60033 / US | [1996/12] | Representative(s) | Hirsz, Christopher Stanislaw, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 1PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/12] | Hirsz, Christopher Stanislaw, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 1PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 95114226.4 | 11.09.1995 | [1996/12] | Priority number, date | US19940308316 | 19.09.1994 Original published format: US 308316 | [1996/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0702405 | Date: | 20.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0702405 | Date: | 14.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/467 | [1996/12] | CPC: |
H01L23/467 (EP,KR,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/12] | Title | German: | Eine pneumatisch gekoppelte Wärmesenkemontage | [1996/12] | English: | A pneumatically coupled heat sink assembly | [1996/12] | French: | Assemblage refroidisseur à couplage pneumatiqe | [1996/12] | Examination procedure | 20.09.1996 | Examination requested [1996/47] | 15.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 20.10.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/19] | Request for further processing for: | 21.10.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 20.10.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.11.1999 | Decision despatched | 29.07.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 29.07.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 14.08.1998 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4753290 (GABUZDA PAUL G [US]) [A] 1,3,9,10* figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [A]US5019880 (HIGGINS III LEO M [US]) [A] 1-3,7-10 * figures 1,6; claim 1 * |