EP0707301 - Power management for a display device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.08.1998 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated 13510 North Central Expressway Dallas, Texas 75243 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/16] | For all designated states TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INCORPORATED 13510 North Central Expressway Dallas, Texas 75243 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Levine, Jules D. 6931 Flintcove Dallas, TX 75248 / US | [1996/16] | Representative(s) | Holt, Michael, et al Texas Instruments Limited European Patent Department 3rd Floor 401 Grafton Gate Milton Keynes MK9 1AQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Holt, Michael, et al Texas Instruments Limited European Patents Department 800 Pavilion Drive Northampton NN4 7YL / GB | ||
Former [1996/16] | Holt, Michael, et al Texas Instruments Limited, Kempton Point, 68 Staines Road West Sunbury-on-Thames, Middlesex TW16 7AX / GB | Application number, filing date | 95114252.0 | 11.09.1995 | [1996/16] | Priority number, date | US19940306282 | 14.09.1994 Original published format: US 306282 | [1996/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0707301 | Date: | 17.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/22 | [1996/16] | CPC: |
G09G3/22 (EP);
G09G3/30 (KR);
G09G2330/021 (EP,KR);
G09G2340/0428 (EP);
G09G3/2003 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/16] | Title | German: | Leistungssteuerung für eine Anzeigeeinrichtung | [1996/16] | English: | Power management for a display device | [1996/16] | French: | Gestion de l'énergie dans un dispositif d'affichage | [1996/16] | Examination procedure | 17.10.1996 | Examination requested [1996/50] | 01.04.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/39] | 28.04.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1998/39] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1997 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0443083 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1,8-13,15 * abstract * * column 2, line 42 - column 3, line 57 *; | [AD]EP0349426 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [AD] 4-6 * abstract * | by applicant | US4857799 | US4940916 | US5194780 | US5225820 |