EP0704197 - Absorbent article [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 23.05.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, WI 54956 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | ||
Former [1997/50] | For all designated states Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | ||
Former [1997/49] | For all designated states Kimberley-Clark Worldwide, Inc. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | ||
Former [1996/14] | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK CORPORATION 401 North Lake Street Neenah, Wisconsin 54956-0349 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Siebers, Bruce Michael 60 Regal Terrace Appleton, WI 54915 / US | 02 /
Travis, Gary Lee 149 Brockway Avenue Oshkosh, WI 54901 / US | 03 /
Odorzynski, Thomas Walter 255 Warren Court Green Bay, WI 54301 / US | [1996/14] | Representative(s) | Davies, Christopher Robert, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Davies, Christopher Robert, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2002/23] | Davies, Christopher Robert, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. Patent and Trade Mark Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | ||
Former [1996/14] | DIEHL GLAESER HILTL & PARTNER Flüggenstrasse 13 D-80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95114306.4 | 17.12.1991 | [1996/14] | Priority number, date | US19900628251 | 17.12.1990 Original published format: US 628251 | [1996/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0704197 | Date: | 03.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0704197 | Date: | 05.06.1996 | [1996/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0704197 | Date: | 11.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/62 | [1996/14] | CPC: |
A61F13/622 (EP,US);
A61F13/15 (KR);
B29L2031/4878 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1996/14] | Title | German: | Saugfähiger Artikel | [1996/14] | English: | Absorbent article | [1996/14] | French: | Article absorbant | [1996/14] | Examination procedure | 12.09.1995 | Examination requested [1996/14] | 21.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 04.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 11.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP91121581.2 / EP0491347 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.02.2006
17.02.2006
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US Opponent's representative Heide, Ute, et al, et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Sulzbacher Straße 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/39] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.02.2006
17.02.2006
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US Opponent's representative Heide, Ute, et al, et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Straße 40-50 65824 Schwalbach / DE | ||
Former [2006/14] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.02.2006
The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US Opponent's representative Borbach, Markus, et al, et al Procter & Gamble European Service GmbH, Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | 17.03.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 27.09.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 10.01.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.02.2008 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 07.02.2008 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2008/26] | 07.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Request for further processing for: | 11.11.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 11.11.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.11.2003 | Decision despatched | 04.11.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 04.11.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.11.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 04.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 03.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 03.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.01.1996 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   05.02.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 11.05.2005 | SE | 18.12.2006 | FR | 31.12.2006 | [2008/40] |
Former [2007/39] | BE | 11.05.2005 | |
SE | 18.12.2006 | ||
Former [2006/13] | BE | 11.05.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0278866 (KAYSERSBERG SA [FR]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 43 - line 52; figures 1,5; claims 1,3,10 * [A] 2,4,5; | [AP]GB2233876 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [AP] 1,2,5-7,10-15 * page 10, line 27 - page 15, line 25; figure 1; claims 1-4 *; | [A]US4299223 (CRONKRITE WILLIAM E) [A] 1,4,5 * column 4, line 25 - column 6, line 54; figures 1-7 *; | [A]EP0319249 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1,2,7 * figures 1-4; claims 1-3 *; | [A]GB2074011 (NOEL LAB SOUTH AFRICA PTY) [A] 1,16 * the whole document *; | [A]US4705710 (MATSUDA YOSHIO [JP]) [A] 17 * column 1, line 66 - column 3, line 18; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | EP0374730 |