EP0706844 - Device for deep-drawing of sheet metal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2000 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schuler SMG GmbH & Co. KG Louis-Schuler-Strasse 1 68753 Waghäusel / DE | [1999/11] |
Former [1996/16] | For all designated states SMG Süddeutsche Maschinenbau GmbH Louis-Schuler-Strasse 1 D-68753 Waghäusel / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Käsmacher, Harald Am Lerchenbühl 27 D-68789 St. Leon-Rot / DE | [1996/16] | Representative(s) | Lichti, Heiner Lichti - Patentanwälte Postfach 41 07 60 76207 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/16] | Lichti, Heiner, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Ing. Heiner Lichti, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. rer. nat. Jost Lempert, Dipl.-Ing. Hartmut Lasch, Postfach 41 07 60 D-76207 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 95114416.1 | 14.09.1995 | [1996/16] | Priority number, date | DE19944436273 | 11.10.1994 Original published format: DE 4436273 | [1996/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0706844 | Date: | 17.04.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0706844 | Date: | 07.08.1996 | [1996/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0706844 | Date: | 11.08.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B21D24/00, B21D45/02 | [1996/28] | CPC: |
B21D24/04 (EP);
B21D24/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1996/16] | B21D24/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1996/16] | Extension states | SI | 14.09.1995 | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Tiefziehen von Blech | [1996/16] | English: | Device for deep-drawing of sheet metal | [1996/16] | French: | Dispositif pour emboutir de la tôle | [1996/16] | Examination procedure | 10.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/36] | 18.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.02.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 11.08.1999 | SE | 11.08.1999 | AT | 14.09.1999 | BE | 30.09.1999 | DK | 11.11.1999 | PT | 11.11.1999 | [2003/45] |
Former [2003/08] | NL | 11.08.1999 | |
SE | 11.08.1999 | ||
AT | 14.09.1999 | ||
BE | 30.09.1999 | ||
PT | 11.11.1999 | ||
Former [2002/23] | SE | 11.08.1999 | |
AT | 14.09.1999 | ||
BE | 30.09.1999 | ||
PT | 11.11.1999 | ||
Former [2001/51] | AT | 14.09.1999 | |
BE | 30.09.1999 | ||
CH | 30.09.1999 | ||
LI | 30.09.1999 | ||
PT | 11.11.1999 | ||
Former [2001/11] | AT | 14.09.1999 | |
BE | 30.09.1999 | ||
PT | 11.11.1999 | ||
Former [2000/43] | BE | 30.09.1999 | |
PT | 11.11.1999 | ||
Former [2000/26] | PT | 11.11.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE852487 (SCHLOEMANN AG) [A] 1 * figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [A]US2713901 (TAYLOR PAUL H) [A] 1,3 * figures 2-5; claims 1,2 *; | [A]DE2913439 (SCHOEN & CIE GMBH) [A] 1,5* figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]DE4028425 (ALCOA GMBH VERPACKWERKE [DE]) [A] 1,5 * figure 1; claim 1 * |