EP0706753 - Hygroscopic rock wool mat [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.08.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.10.2000 [2000/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Behrens, Wolfgang Trespenmoor 25 D-27243 Gross Ippener / DE | [1996/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1996/16] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Thömen & Körner Zeppelinstraße 5 30175 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/16] | Patentanwälte Thömen & Körner Zeppelinstrasse 5 D-30175 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 95114433.6 | 14.09.1995 | [1996/16] | Priority number, date | DE19944436443 | 13.10.1994 Original published format: DE 4436443 | [1996/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0706753 | Date: | 17.04.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0706753 | Date: | 20.10.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A01G1/00, E04D11/00 | [1996/16] | CPC: |
E04D11/002 (EP,US);
A01G20/20 (EP,US);
Y02A30/254 (EP,US);
Y02B80/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL [1996/16] | Title | German: | Hygroskopische Steinwollmatte | [1996/16] | English: | Hygroscopic rock wool mat | [1996/16] | French: | Tapis de laine de roche hygroscopique | [1996/16] | Examination procedure | 15.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/20] | 27.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.01.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.04.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3200869 (BEHRENS WOLFGANG) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE3805069 (BEHRENS WOLFGANG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 20 - column 4, line 39; figure - *; | [A]DE9314533U (GRUENZWEIG & HARTMANN [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5301466 (EGAN MICHAEL A [US]) [A] 1* figure . *; | [AD]DE4219275 (BEHRENS WOLFGANG [DE]) [AD] 1,2,4-7 * the whole document *; | [E]EP0677242 (BEHRENS WOLFGANG [DE]) [E] 1 * column 3, line 49 - line 54; claim 1 * | by applicant | DE4219275 |