EP0763341 - Wet wipes with low viscosity silicone emulsion systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.06.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2006 | Refusal of application | published on 26.07.2006 [2006/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/12] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bogdanski, Michael Scott Dengler Strasse 78 D-53173 Bonn / DE | 02 /
Glaser, Ursula Christine Feldberg Strasse 24 D-55118 Mainz / DE | [1997/12] | Representative(s) | Boon, Graham Anthony, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/20] | Boon, Graham Anthony, et al Elkington and Fife LLP, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [1997/12] | Hirsch, Uwe Thomas, et al Procter & Gamble European Service GmbH, Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 95114587.9 | 15.09.1995 | [1997/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0763341 | Date: | 19.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A47L13/17 | [1997/12] | CPC: |
A61K8/0208 (EP);
B32B27/00 (KR);
A45D44/00 (EP);
A61K8/06 (EP);
A61K8/062 (EP);
A61K8/34 (EP);
A61K8/891 (EP);
A61K8/892 (EP);
A61Q1/14 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1997/12] | Title | German: | Nasse Tücher mit niedrigviskosen Silikonemulsionszusammensetzungen | [1997/12] | English: | Wet wipes with low viscosity silicone emulsion systems | [1997/12] | French: | Emulsions à basse viscosité de silicone pour tissus mouillés | [1997/12] | Examination procedure | 30.08.1997 | Examination requested [1997/44] | 04.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.02.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 08.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2006/30] | 27.04.2006 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2006/30] | Appeal following examination | 21.03.2003 | Appeal received No. T0751/03 | 21.05.2003 | Statement of grounds filed | 27.04.2006 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 27.04.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.05.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Request for further processing for: | 08.05.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 08.05.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.05.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 05.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0576327 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]EP0365160 (SCOTT PAPER CO [US]) [A] 1 * claim - *; | [A]DE4136540 (AMERICAN ISRAELI PAPER MILLS [IL]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5043155 (PUCHALSKI EUGENE [US], et al) [A] 1 * claim - * |