EP0703213 - Process for producing bis(aminomethyl)cyclohexane [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.05.1999 [1999/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/22] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | ||
Former [1996/13] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo, 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kobayashi, Shoichi, Mitsubishi Gas Chem. Co. Inc. Niigata Factory, 3500, Matsuhama-cho Niigata-shi, Niigata-ken / JP | 02 /
Naito, Susumu, c/o Mitsubishi Gas Chem. Co. Inc. Niigata Factory, 3500, Matsuhama-cho Niigata-shi, Niigata-ken / JP | [1996/13] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/13] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 D-81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95114881.6 | 21.09.1995 | [1996/13] | Priority number, date | JP19940226740 | 21.09.1994 Original published format: JP 22674094 | [1996/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0703213 | Date: | 27.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0703213 | Date: | 16.10.1996 | [1996/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0703213 | Date: | 27.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07C209/72, C07C211/18 | [1996/42] | CPC: |
C07C211/18 (EP,US);
C07C209/72 (EP,US);
C07C2601/14 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/13] | C07C209/72 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1996/13] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Bis(Aminomethyl)Cyclohexan | [1996/13] | English: | Process for producing bis(aminomethyl)cyclohexane | [1996/13] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation du bis(aminométhyl)cyclohexane | [1996/13] | Examination procedure | 13.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/02] | 17.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.11.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5416452 ; | [A]JPS5379840 ; | [AD]JPS4226783B ; | [A]DE2164169 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO., INC.) [A] 1,7,8 * claims 1-4 *; | [A]DE2511280 (SUN VENTURES INC) [A] 1,7,8 * the whole document *; | [D]JPS50126638 ; | [D]JPS517659 (KAWATETSU KIZAI KOGYO CO); | [A]DE3003731 (SUNTECH) [A] 1,7,8 * the whole document *; | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19790413), vol. 003, no. 043, Database accession no. (C - 042), & JP54016452 A 19790207 (TAKEDA YAKUHIN KOGYO K.K.) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19780929), vol. 002, no. 117, Database accession no. (C - 023), & JP53079840 A 19780714 (TAKEDA YAKUHIN KOGYO K.K.) [A] 1 * abstract * | [AD] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 68, no. 00, Database accession no. 68-97848P, XP002009103 & JPS4226783B B1 19671219 (TOYO RAYON CO LTD) [AD] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | JPS4226783B | JPS50126638 | JPS517659B | JPS6113461B |