EP0706004 - Relief valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER CORPORATION 100 Bayer Road Pittsburgh, PA 15205-9741 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/32] | For all designated states Bayer Corporation 100 Bayer Road Pittsburgh, PA 15205-9741 / US | ||
Former [1997/40] | For all designated states Bayer Corporation 100 Bayer Road Pittsburgh, PA 15205 / US | ||
Former [1996/15] | For all designated states Bayer Corporation One Mellon Center 500 Grant Street Pittsburgh, PA 15219-2502 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Behringer, Bruce E. 25 Fairview Avenue New Jersey 07656 / US | [1996/15] | Representative(s) | Burkert, Frank, et al Bayer Schering Pharma Aktiengesellschaft Law and Patents Patents and Licensing Building Q 18 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/04] | Burkert, Frank, et al Bayer AG, Konzernbereich RP Patente und Lizenzen 51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [1996/15] | Kirchner, Dietrich, et al Bayer AG Konzernzentrale RP Patente Konzern D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Application number, filing date | 95115032.5 | 25.09.1995 | [1996/15] | Priority number, date | US19940319857 | 07.10.1994 Original published format: US 319857 | [1996/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0706004 | Date: | 10.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0706004 | Date: | 05.03.1997 | [1997/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0706004 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F16K17/04, F16K7/17 | [1997/07] | CPC: |
F15C3/04 (EP);
F16K7/12 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1996/15] | F16K17/04 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1996/15] | Title | German: | Entlastungsventil | [1996/15] | English: | Relief valve | [1996/15] | French: | Robinet de décharge | [1996/15] | Examination procedure | 05.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/45] | 24.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 25.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 08.02.2001 | Appeal received No. T0768/01 | 09.04.2001 | Statement of grounds filed | 16.07.2001 | Interlocutory revision of appeal | 16.07.2001 | Result of appeal procedure: other kind of disposal | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 06.08.2003 | CH | 06.08.2003 | LI | 06.08.2003 | NL | 06.08.2003 | DK | 06.11.2003 | SE | 06.11.2003 | [2004/29] |
Former [2004/28] | BE | 06.08.2003 | |
CH | 06.08.2003 | ||
LI | 06.08.2003 | ||
NL | 06.08.2003 | ||
SE | 06.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | CH | 06.08.2003 | |
LI | 06.08.2003 | ||
NL | 06.08.2003 | ||
SE | 06.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/16] | NL | 06.08.2003 | |
SE | 06.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | NL | 06.08.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3844529 (BRANDT R, et al) [X] 1-4 * column 3, line 4 - column 4, line 20; figure - *; | [X]DE3209643 (GISE FRHR VON HARDO DR MED) [X] 1-4 * page 4, line 3 - line 24; figure . *; | [DA]US4852851 (WEBSTER MILO E [US]) [DA] 1-3 * column 2, line 23 - column 3, line 23; figure - *; | [A]WO9200476 (SAUNDERS VALVE CO LTD [GB]) [A] 1-3,5,6,8-10 * page 3, line 25 - page 4, line 20; figure 1 *; | [A]FR2311239 (KADEN WALTER [ZA]) [A] 1-5,7,8 * page 3, line 17 - line 34; figures 1-3,6 * | by applicant | US4875956 |